15591 Cases | Miamisburg Municipal New Suits
Case Number | Defendant | Date | |||||||
17CVG00663 | SHANE RETHERFORD, ET. AL | 5/2/2017 | |||||||
SUN SECURED FINANCING, LLC. DBA OAKWOOD VILLAGE vs SHANE RETHERFORD, ET. AL | |||||||||
17CVF00650 | ANA J. CARRION | 5/1/2017 | |||||||
CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A. vs ANA J. CARRION | |||||||||
17CVF00651 | MORGAN LEE CARPENTER | 5/1/2017 | |||||||
PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC vs MORGAN LEE CARPENTER | |||||||||
17CVF00652 | CAROLLYNNE L. HEHL | 5/1/2017 | |||||||
PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC vs CAROLLYNNE L. HEHL | |||||||||
17CVF00653 | BRITTANY KEYS | 5/1/2017 | |||||||
DISCOVER BANK C/O DISCOVER PRODUCTS, INC. vs BRITTANY KEYS | |||||||||
17CVF00676 | JULIE A. DUHL | 5/1/2017 | |||||||
PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC vs JULIE A. DUHL | |||||||||
17CVG00654 | JOHN MCKENZIE, ET. AL | 5/1/2017 | |||||||
DARRELL ABNER vs JOHN MCKENZIE, ET. AL | |||||||||
17CVH00655 | DON PETIT | 5/1/2017 | |||||||
ALECIA BOWLING-GRIFFITHS vs DON PETIT | |||||||||
17CVH00648 | DON PETIT REGISTRAR | 4/28/2017 | |||||||
PATRICK OCONNELL vs DON PETIT REGISTRAR | |||||||||
17CVH00649 | DON PETIT, REGISTRAR | 4/28/2017 | |||||||
CAMRON K TAYLOR vs DON PETIT, REGISTRAR | |||||||||
17CVE00646 | PROGRESSIVE INSURANCE COMPANY | 4/26/2017 | |||||||
NICOLE A. JONES vs PROGRESSIVE INSURANCE COMPANY | |||||||||
17CVG00645 | ASHLEY MILLER, ET. AL | 4/26/2017 | |||||||
WASHINGTON PLACE LTD. vs ASHLEY MILLER, ET. AL | |||||||||
17CVF00647 | KELLY B. CLAWSON | 4/26/2017 | |||||||
CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA) , NA vs KELLY B. CLAWSON | |||||||||
17CVF00644 | AUHJANAE D. DAVIS | 4/26/2017 | |||||||
PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC vs AUHJANAE D. DAVIS | |||||||||
17CVF00643 | DARREN CROWE | 4/26/2017 | |||||||
PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC vs DARREN CROWE | |||||||||
17CVF00636 | BRIAN SIMPSON | 4/25/2017 | |||||||
BRINKLEY PROPERTIES, LTD. vs BRIAN SIMPSON | |||||||||
17CVF00642 | TODD C. CATCHPOLE | 4/25/2017 | |||||||
PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC vs TODD C. CATCHPOLE | |||||||||
17CVG00620 | BROOKE JEWELL, ET. AL | 4/25/2017 | |||||||
BERKSHIRE REALTY GROUP, LLC DBA CROWN WOODHILLS APTS. vs BROOKE JEWELL, ET. AL | |||||||||
17CVG00621 | MELISSA FITE, ET. AL | 4/25/2017 | |||||||
TOWNE PROPERTIES DBA INDIAN LOOKOUT APARTMENTS vs MELISSA FITE, ET. AL | |||||||||
Previous 1, 2, 3 ... 466, 467, 468 ... 778, 779, 780 Next |