Daily Law Journal
10252 Cases | Miamisburg Municipal New Suits
Case Number Defendant Date
14CVF00577 TRVLYN J MATTA 4/29/2014
LEBANON EQUINE CLINIC, INC vs TRVLYN J MATTA
14CVF00578 MIRANDA MCINTOSH 4/29/2014
LEBANON EQUINE CLINIC, INC vs MIRANDA MCINTOSH
14CVF00579 COREY T TEAGUE 4/29/2014
KETTERING MEDICAL CENTER vs COREY T TEAGUE
14CVG00576 VINCENT ANDREWS 4/29/2014
ADARA COMMUNITIES DBA HUNTERS CHASE APARTMENTS vs VINCENT ANDREWS
14CVF00575 TIMOTHY A AUSTIN 4/28/2014
CARROLLTON POINTE APTS vs TIMOTHY A AUSTIN
14CVF00584 LISA V. TAYLOR 4/28/2014
CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA) N.A. vs LISA V. TAYLOR
14CVH00574 MIKE RANKIN, REG 4/28/2014
JONATHON J MCKOWN vs MIKE RANKIN, REG
14CVI00583 DAYTON DUTCH LIONS LLC 4/28/2014
NICHOLAS CERVI vs DAYTON DUTCH LIONS LLC
14CVF00572 ARIEL MARSHALL 4/28/2014
DAYTON OSTEOP HOSP ANESTHESIA vs ARIEL MARSHALL
14CVF00573 TOMMIE S HUTCHINSON 4/28/2014
CARROLLTON POINTE APTS vs TOMMIE S HUTCHINSON
14CVG00569 HOLLY BEEKER, ET AL. 4/25/2014
CURTIS WRIGHT vs HOLLY BEEKER, ET AL.
14CVG00570 CHARLES TRAGESSER, ET AL III 4/25/2014
VINEBROOK HOMES OH, LLC vs CHARLES TRAGESSER, ET AL III
14CVG00571 JR & C CONSTRUCTION, ET AL 4/25/2014
TOWNE PROPERTIES DBA CENTERVILLE PARK APARTMENTS vs JR & C CONSTRUCTION, ET AL
14CVF00567 ANNALEE JOHNSON 4/24/2014
LVNV FUNDING LLC C/O RESURGENT CAPITAL SERVICES L vs ANNALEE JOHNSON
14CVF00568 AMANDA WHITE 4/24/2014
WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A. C/O LEVY & ASSOC., LLC vs AMANDA WHITE
14CVG00564 ROBERT SIMPSON 4/24/2014
ESTATE OF HAZEL CARTER C/O BETTY CREECH vs ROBERT SIMPSON
14CVG00554 STEVE HOBBS 4/23/2014
ELIZABETH WEBB vs STEVE HOBBS
14CVE00552 RONTE JEVON GRANT 4/23/2014
WESTERN RESERVE MUTUAL CASUALTY CO AS SUBROGEE OF vs RONTE JEVON GRANT
14CVF00551 MICHAEL ROSE 4/23/2014
SENEX SERVICES CORP SUCCESSOR IN INTEREST TO vs MICHAEL ROSE

Previous  1, 2, 3 ... 453, 454, 455 ... 511, 512, 513  Next