Daily Law Journal
9471 Cases | Miamisburg Municipal New Suits
Case Number Defendant Date
13CVH01773 MIKE RANKIN REGISTRAR 11/25/2013
BRYANT L BEAVERS vs MIKE RANKIN REGISTRAR
13CVG01771 CHRIS PACIFICO 11/22/2013
AMERICAN HOMES 4 RENT PROPERTIES FOUR, LLC vs CHRIS PACIFICO
13CVH01769 MIKE RANKIN REGISTRAR 11/22/2013
NICHOLAS PETROSINO vs MIKE RANKIN REGISTRAR
13CVG01768 SARAH HINES, ET AL 11/22/2013
TOWNE PROPERTIES DBA MIAMISBURG BY THE MALL vs SARAH HINES, ET AL
13CVG01770 DENNIS HALEY 11/22/2013
AH4R-OH, LLC vs DENNIS HALEY
13CVE01760 LUCAS B. CREEKMUR, A MINOR 11/21/2013
STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTO. INS. CO. AS SUBRO OF ANGELA M. SLATE vs LUCAS B. CREEKMUR, A ...
13CVG01766 SHARA WERTS 11/21/2013
BETTY WERTS vs SHARA WERTS
13CVG01767 SARAH HAGGY, ET AL 11/21/2013
LEE WEIDNER vs SARAH HAGGY, ET AL
13CVG01750 CAITLIN ROBERTS, ET AL. 11/20/2013
TOWNE PROPERTIES MIAMISBURG BY THE MALL APTS. vs CAITLIN ROBERTS, ET AL.
13CVH01751 MIKE RANKIN REGISTRAR 11/20/2013
BILL MADWELL III vs MIKE RANKIN REGISTRAR
13CVG01753 ANDEREA ROBINSON, ET AL. 11/20/2013
TOWNE PROPERTIES MIAMISBURG BY THE MALL APTS. vs ANDEREA ROBINSON, ET AL.
13CVG01754 TODD P BUTCHKO, ET AL. 11/20/2013
AUTUMN WOODS APARTMENTS vs TODD P BUTCHKO, ET AL.
13CVG01755 STEVE FRENCH, ET AL 11/20/2013
AUTUMN WOODS APARTMENTS vs STEVE FRENCH, ET AL
13CVG01756 ZACHERY W. THOMAS, ET AL. 11/20/2013
AUTUMN WOODS APARTMENTS vs ZACHERY W. THOMAS, ET AL.
13CVG01757 JESSICA FRALEY, ET AL. 11/20/2013
AUTUMN WOODS APARTMENTS vs JESSICA FRALEY, ET AL.
13CVE01762 CHRISTIE M. JONES 11/20/2013
GEICO CASUALTY COMPANY C/O KREINER & PETERS CO. L.P.A. vs CHRISTIE M. JONES
13CVG01758 MATTHEW B. REED, ET AL. 11/20/2013
AUTUMN WOODS APARTMENTS vs MATTHEW B. REED, ET AL.
13CVE01749 ZACHARY PHILPOT 11/19/2013
CINCINNATI INSURANCE COMPANY vs ZACHARY PHILPOT
13CVF01739 CANDI MCCOY 11/19/2013
SENEX SERVICES CORP SUCCESSOR IN INTEREST TO vs CANDI MCCOY

Previous  1, 2, 3 ... 444, 445, 446 ... 472, 473, 474  Next