15571 Cases | Miamisburg Municipal New Suits
Case Number | Defendant | Date | |||||||
17CVG01095 | JAISEN SKIPWITH, ET. AL | 7/14/2017 | |||||||
GAWAIN CIRCLE, LP DBA CAMBRIDGE COMMONS APTS. vs JAISEN SKIPWITH, ET. AL | |||||||||
17CVG01096 | BENNY BLEDSOE, ET. AL | 7/14/2017 | |||||||
GAWAIN CIRCLE, LP DBA CAMBRIDGE COMMONS APTS. vs BENNY BLEDSOE, ET. AL | |||||||||
17CVG01097 | DEVON HESS, ET. AL | 7/14/2017 | |||||||
GAWAIN CIRCLE, LP DBA CAMBRIDGE COMMONS APTS. vs DEVON HESS, ET. AL | |||||||||
17CVG01094 | TRACIE MILLER, ET. AL | 7/14/2017 | |||||||
GAWAIN CIRCLE, LP DBA CAMBRIDGE COMMONS APTS. vs TRACIE MILLER, ET. AL | |||||||||
17CVG01088 | MICHAEL DRAKE, ET AL. | 7/13/2017 | |||||||
BLANCHE CORSAW vs MICHAEL DRAKE, ET AL. | |||||||||
17CVG01089 | KELLY OKAN, ET AL. | 7/13/2017 | |||||||
LINDA M CARDIFF vs KELLY OKAN, ET AL. | |||||||||
17CVH01086 | DON PETIT, REGISTRAR | 7/13/2017 | |||||||
MICHAEL W GEORGE vs DON PETIT, REGISTRAR | |||||||||
17CVH01087 | DON PETIT REGISTRAR | 7/13/2017 | |||||||
LAYTON RAMSEY vs DON PETIT REGISTRAR | |||||||||
17CVH01090 | MONTGOMERY COUNTY ANIMAL RESOURC | 7/13/2017 | |||||||
ANDREA BRANSCOMB vs MONTGOMERY COUNTY ANIMAL RESOURC | |||||||||
17CVF01083 | TAYLOR TUCKER | 7/12/2017 | |||||||
CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A. C/O CHEEK LAW OFFICES, LLC vs TAYLOR TUCKER | |||||||||
17CVH01081 | MONTGOMERY COUNTY ANIMAL RESOURC | 7/12/2017 | |||||||
AMBER LAINHART vs MONTGOMERY COUNTY ANIMAL RESOURC | |||||||||
17CVF01082 | DAVID PERKINS | 7/12/2017 | |||||||
MARINER FINANCE, LLC. vs DAVID PERKINS | |||||||||
17CVG01073 | MARK BROWN, ET.AL | 7/11/2017 | |||||||
JESSE H BURCHETT vs MARK BROWN, ET.AL | |||||||||
17CVG01074 | NATHAN WALHEY, ET. AL | 7/11/2017 | |||||||
JESSE H BURCHETT vs NATHAN WALHEY, ET. AL | |||||||||
17CVG01075 | APRIL LOVELL, ET. AL | 7/11/2017 | |||||||
DEBBIE DUNN AND DELIA MCKENZIE vs APRIL LOVELL, ET. AL | |||||||||
17CVG01078 | CINDY LEWIS, ET. AL | 7/11/2017 | |||||||
HUNTERS CHASE DAYTON LLC DBA HUNTERS CHASE APARTMENTS vs CINDY LEWIS, ET. AL | |||||||||
17CVG01079 | JAJU DURAID, ET. AL | 7/11/2017 | |||||||
HUNTERS CHASE DAYTON LLC DBA HUNTERS CHASE APARTMENTS vs JAJU DURAID, ET. AL | |||||||||
17CVG01080 | WILLIAM WARMAN, ET. AL | 7/11/2017 | |||||||
HUNTERS CHASE DAYTON LLC DBA HUNTERS CHASE APARTMENTS vs WILLIAM WARMAN, ET. AL | |||||||||
17CVF01084 | JONATHAN L. ALLEN | 7/10/2017 | |||||||
TIDEWATER CREDIT SERVICES, LLC. vs JONATHAN L. ALLEN | |||||||||
Previous 1, 2, 3 ... 434, 435, 436 ... 777, 778, 779 Next |