15571 Cases | Miamisburg Municipal New Suits
Case Number | Defendant | Date | |||||||
17CVG01225 | MARCUS L. IVERY, JR., ET. AL | 8/7/2017 | |||||||
EAGLE RIDGE TOWNHOMES, LLC. SIIT SUNDANCE PROPERTIES MANAGEMENT, vs MARCUS L. IVERY,... | |||||||||
17CVG01222 | DONISHA WILKS, ET. AL | 8/7/2017 | |||||||
SUSAN DIGIORGIO vs DONISHA WILKS, ET. AL | |||||||||
17CVI01220 | MATTIE BELLE REESE | 8/4/2017 | |||||||
JONATHAN TAYLOR vs MATTIE BELLE REESE | |||||||||
17CVG01216 | AMY SELF, ET AL. | 8/3/2017 | |||||||
BRIAN ALLER vs AMY SELF, ET AL. | |||||||||
17CVG01217 | CRAIG SCHWABLE, ET AL. | 8/3/2017 | |||||||
SUN SECURED FINANCING, LLC DBA OAKWOOD VILLAGE vs CRAIG SCHWABLE, ET AL. | |||||||||
17CVH01219 | DON PETIT REGISTRAR | 8/3/2017 | |||||||
MICHAEL O KIRKLAND vs DON PETIT REGISTRAR | |||||||||
17CVI01218 | ROBERT REED, JR ( AKA BOBBY) | 8/3/2017 | |||||||
DONALD HALL vs ROBERT REED, JR ( AKA BOBBY) | |||||||||
17CVG01213 | ROBERT B. ROUNTREE, ET. AL | 8/2/2017 | |||||||
JEFFREY P. STORER vs ROBERT B. ROUNTREE, ET. AL | |||||||||
17CVG01212 | KYLE LAMB, ET. AL | 8/2/2017 | |||||||
ALICE YEH vs KYLE LAMB, ET. AL | |||||||||
17CVF01214 | BRANDON M. MORGAN | 8/2/2017 | |||||||
STERLING JEWELERS INC. DBA JARED-GALLERIA OF JEWELRY vs BRANDON M. MORGAN | |||||||||
17CVE01215 | HIDDEN ACRE TRANSPORTATION, LLC. | 8/2/2017 | |||||||
UNDERWOOD TRUCKING, LLC. vs HIDDEN ACRE TRANSPORTATION, LLC. | |||||||||
17CVI01211 | TIA VARNEY | 8/1/2017 | |||||||
CHONDA SWANTON vs TIA VARNEY | |||||||||
17CVF01205 | SAUNDRA L WRIGHT | 7/31/2017 | |||||||
CITIBANK, N.A. SUCC. TO CITIBANK (SD), N.A. vs SAUNDRA L WRIGHT | |||||||||
17CVF01206 | JOSEPH A ZAMMIT | 7/31/2017 | |||||||
MERRICK BANK CORPORATION vs JOSEPH A ZAMMIT | |||||||||
17CVF01207 | CHARLES M COOK | 7/31/2017 | |||||||
MIDLAND FUNDING LLC DB IN OHIO AS MIDLAND FUNDING DE vs CHARLES M COOK | |||||||||
17CVF01208 | TIMOTHY T THOMAS | 7/31/2017 | |||||||
CAVALRY SPV I, LLC vs TIMOTHY T THOMAS | |||||||||
17CVF01209 | CHRIS GIBSON | 7/31/2017 | |||||||
WORLDS FOREMOST BANK C/O LEVY & ASSOCIATES, LLC vs CHRIS GIBSON | |||||||||
17CVF01210 | DORA SMITH | 7/31/2017 | |||||||
PCA ACQUISITIONS V, LLC C/O LEVY & ASSOCIATES, LLC vs DORA SMITH | |||||||||
17CVG01201 | PRINCESS HITCHCOCK, ET. AL | 7/31/2017 | |||||||
GAWAIN CIRCLE, LP DBA CAMBRIDGE COMMONS APTS. vs PRINCESS HITCHCOCK, ET. AL | |||||||||
Previous 1, 2, 3 ... 429, 430, 431 ... 777, 778, 779 Next |