Daily Law Journal
9864 Cases | Miamisburg Municipal New Suits
Case Number Defendant Date
14CVG00657 ALVIN W. VANCIL, ET AL. 5/15/2014
ADARA COMMUNITIES DBA HUNTERS CHASE APARTMENTS vs ALVIN W. VANCIL, ET AL.
14CVG00656 AMANDA SALLY, ET AL. 5/14/2014
KATHY LAMBERT vs AMANDA SALLY, ET AL.
14CVG00658 MATTHEW ENGLE, ET AL. 5/14/2014
JOSEPH W WALKER vs MATTHEW ENGLE, ET AL.
14CVF00655 KELLY CALLENTINE 5/14/2014
MIDLAND FUNDING LLC DBA IN OHIO AS MIDLAND FUNDING D vs KELLY CALLENTINE
14CVI00654 SPEEDWAY C/O NICOLE OVERBAY 5/13/2014
GAIL REAGAN vs SPEEDWAY C/O NICOLE OVERBAY
14CVI00649 CHRISTIE CLAYTOR, GUARDIAN OF DESTINY CLAYTOR, MI... 5/9/2014
EBONY TUCK vs CHRISTIE CLAYTOR, GUARDIAN OF DESTINY CLAYTOR, MI...
14CVG00642 AMANDA MCGUIRE, ET AL. 5/9/2014
IDEAL MOBILE HOMES SALES & PARK INC vs AMANDA MCGUIRE, ET AL.
14CVG00650 HOUSE OF HARRISON 5/9/2014
AMERICAN HEALTH & FITNESS, LLC C/O DOUGLAS THOMPSON vs HOUSE OF HARRISON
14CVG00651 BRENDA K ROBERTS 5/9/2014
GREATER DAYTON PREMIER MANAGEMEN vs BRENDA K ROBERTS
14CVF00641 TIMOTHY L. CABLE 5/8/2014
PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOC., LLC vs TIMOTHY L. CABLE
14CVF00643 WILLIAM SWEENEY 5/8/2014
PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOC., LLC vs WILLIAM SWEENEY
14CVF00634 SIERRA N. CENTER 5/8/2014
PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOC., LLC vs SIERRA N. CENTER
14CVF00635 CARLOS BAJANA 5/8/2014
PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOC., LLC vs CARLOS BAJANA
14CVF00636 KATHY BALI 5/8/2014
PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOC., LLC vs KATHY BALI
14CVF00639 MICHELE MCMURCHY 5/8/2014
PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOC., LLC vs MICHELE MCMURCHY

Previous  1, 2, 3 ... 420, 421, 422 ... 492, 493, 494  Next