Daily Law Journal
8740 Cases | Miamisburg Municipal New Suits
Case Number Defendant Date
17CVF01785 BRITTANY QUILLEN 11/6/2017
CREDIT ACCEPTANCE CORPORATION vs BRITTANY QUILLEN
17CVG01768 ALEJANDRO GARCIA, AND ALL OTHERS 11/6/2017
ROSS RENTALS vs ALEJANDRO GARCIA, AND ALL OTHERS
17CVF01780 MARTIN MOLES 11/6/2017
CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A. vs MARTIN MOLES
17CVG01769 EUNICE BUTLER, AND ALL OTHERS 11/6/2017
TEAMSTERS ASSISTANCE PROGRAMS, INC. vs EUNICE BUTLER, AND ALL OTHERS
17CVF01781 LEIGHA FLETCHER 11/6/2017
MIDLAND FUNDING DE LLC DBI OHIO AS MIDLAND FUNDING DE LLC vs LEIGHA FLETCHER
17CVG01770 DEBRA MCNESS, ET AL 11/6/2017
CMC PROPERTIES vs DEBRA MCNESS, ET AL
17CVF01782 ROBERT GOMES 11/6/2017
SECURITY NATIONAL BANK, DIVISION OF THE PARK NATIONAL BANK vs ROBERT GOMES
17CVF01783 TODD GEIGER 11/6/2017
MIDLAND FUNDING LLC DBI OHIO MIDLAND FUNDING DE LLC vs TODD GEIGER
17CVF01784 CHRISTA COLLINS 11/6/2017
MIDLAND FUNDING LLC DBI OHIO MIDLAND FUNDING DE LLC vs CHRISTA COLLINS
17CVG01754 MIR ALI 11/3/2017
ASHLLYN ALDRIDGE vs MIR ALI
17CVI01751 SAMANTHA DEAN 11/2/2017
DOUBLETREE SUITES BY HILTON SPENCER STRICKLER - MANAGER vs SAMANTHA DEAN
17CVF01748 ANTHONY TRIMBLE 11/2/2017
NICHE PRODUCTIONS, LLC vs ANTHONY TRIMBLE
17CVG01747 AIMEE PLESA, AND ALL OTHERS 11/1/2017
MANDARIN APARTMENTS, LLC vs AIMEE PLESA, AND ALL OTHERS
17CVG01749 DANIEL ALLEN 11/1/2017
PLAZA MIAMISBURG, LLC vs DANIEL ALLEN
17CVI01742 TIM HORTON'S ATTN: MANGER 10/31/2017
RUBY N SNYDER-HENDRICKS vs TIM HORTON'S ATTN: MANGER
17CVI01743 LUCAS VAN AUSDOLL 10/31/2017
DARRIN SCHLUTER vs LUCAS VAN AUSDOLL
17CVF01745 SHANTEL CAMPBELL 10/30/2017
KINGSLEY LTD DBA STILLWATER PARK APARTMENTS vs SHANTEL CAMPBELL
17CVF01746 DEANA M JORDAN 10/30/2017
KETTERING ANESTHESIA ASSOC INC vs DEANA M JORDAN
17CVF01738 ANGEL CLARKSON, AND ALL OTHERS 10/30/2017
SUN SECURED FINANCING, LLC DBA OAKWOOD VILLAGE vs ANGEL CLARKSON, AND ALL OTHERS

Previous  1, 2, 3, ... 435, 436, 437  Next