15571 Cases | Miamisburg Municipal New Suits
Case Number | Defendant | Date | |||||||
15CVF01360 | DANIEL FORTMAN | 9/28/2015 | |||||||
CAVALRY SPV I, LLC vs DANIEL FORTMAN | |||||||||
15CVG01339 | DEVONAIR J. O'NEAL, ET AL | 9/28/2015 | |||||||
BRINKLEY PROPERTIES, LTD. vs DEVONAIR J. O'NEAL, ET AL | |||||||||
15CVI01340 | JAMIE KUNTZ | 9/28/2015 | |||||||
INTERSTATE FORD, INC. vs JAMIE KUNTZ | |||||||||
15CVF01358 | BONNIE BUCK | 9/28/2015 | |||||||
CAVALRY SPV I, LLC vs BONNIE BUCK | |||||||||
15CVI01338 | BRYSON WITT | 9/25/2015 | |||||||
DEBORAH BAILEY vs BRYSON WITT | |||||||||
15CVG01319 | JOHN BARNEY, ET AL. | 9/23/2015 | |||||||
TOWNE PROPERTIES DBA INDIAN LOOKOUT APTS. vs JOHN BARNEY, ET AL. | |||||||||
15CVG01327 | JOSH SAGE, ET AL. | 9/23/2015 | |||||||
CARROLLTON POINTE APARTMENTS, LL vs JOSH SAGE, ET AL. | |||||||||
15CVG01326 | SUE SMITCHENS, ET AL | 9/23/2015 | |||||||
TOWNE PROPERTIES DBA INDIAN LOOKOUT APTS. vs SUE SMITCHENS, ET AL | |||||||||
15CVG01325 | LATONIA GUDGER, ET AL. | 9/23/2015 | |||||||
TOWNE PROPERTIES DBA INDIAN LOOKOUT APTS. vs LATONIA GUDGER, ET AL. | |||||||||
15CVG01323 | JOSHUA PIPES, ET AL. | 9/23/2015 | |||||||
HIDDEN LAKES APARTMENTS vs JOSHUA PIPES, ET AL. | |||||||||
15CVG01321 | CHEVELLA GRIFFITH, ET AL. | 9/23/2015 | |||||||
VAUGHAN GROUP LTD FOR: MIAMIWOOD PROPERTIES LLC vs CHEVELLA GRIFFITH, ET AL. | |||||||||
15CVF01335 | GRETA M HENZ | 9/23/2015 | |||||||
CACH, LLC vs GRETA M HENZ | |||||||||
15CVF01334 | MYRA R WILLIAMS | 9/23/2015 | |||||||
CREDIT ACCEPTANCE CORPORATION vs MYRA R WILLIAMS | |||||||||
15CVF01333 | ROXEANNE TORRES | 9/23/2015 | |||||||
MIDLAND FUNDING LLC DBI OHIO AS MIDLAND FUNDING DE L vs ROXEANNE TORRES | |||||||||
15CVF01331 | APRIL HARLOW | 9/23/2015 | |||||||
LVNV FUNDING LLC C/O RESURGENT CAPITAL SERVICES L vs APRIL HARLOW | |||||||||
15CVF01328 | JENNIFER L. CLARK | 9/23/2015 | |||||||
CALVARY SPV I, LLC vs JENNIFER L. CLARK | |||||||||
15CVG01317 | TREVOR MERGLER, ET AL | 9/22/2015 | |||||||
GARRETT BROUGHTON vs TREVOR MERGLER, ET AL | |||||||||
15CVF01329 | STARRE CROUSE AKA STARRE A. CROUSE | 9/21/2015 | |||||||
MIDLAND FUNDING LLC DOING BUSINESS IN OHIO AS MIDLAND vs STARRE CROUSE AKA STARRE A.... | |||||||||
15CVF01330 | MARK L WOOLERY | 9/21/2015 | |||||||
CBCS vs MARK L WOOLERY | |||||||||
Previous 1, 2, 3 ... 621, 622, 623 ... 777, 778, 779 Next |