15571 Cases | Miamisburg Municipal New Suits
Case Number | Defendant | Date | |||||||
15CVG01513 | DANA HUNTER, ET AL | 10/30/2015 | |||||||
KATHY LAMBERT vs DANA HUNTER, ET AL | |||||||||
15CVH01511 | DON PETIT, REGISTAR | 10/29/2015 | |||||||
MARK RILEY vs DON PETIT, REGISTAR | |||||||||
15CVH01512 | DON PETIT, REGISTAR | 10/29/2015 | |||||||
RANDY R ADKINS vs DON PETIT, REGISTAR | |||||||||
15CVF01508 | FRANCESCA DORSEY AKA FRANCESCA S DORSEY | 10/28/2015 | |||||||
AMERICAN EXPRESS BANK, FSB C/O ZWICKER & ASSOCIATES, P.C. vs FRANCESCA DORSEY AK... | |||||||||
15CVF01510 | BONNIEJEAN BLAS | 10/28/2015 | |||||||
MARINER FINANCE LLC vs BONNIEJEAN BLAS | |||||||||
15CVG01495 | DESTINY K. FREEZE | 10/27/2015 | |||||||
CLIFFORD DENNIS vs DESTINY K. FREEZE | |||||||||
15CVG01496 | JEFF MCNABB, ET AL | 10/27/2015 | |||||||
TOWNE PROPERTIES DBA CENTERVILLE PARK APARTMENTS vs JEFF MCNABB, ET AL | |||||||||
15CVF01491 | LISA CHIN | 10/26/2015 | |||||||
LVNV FUNDING, LLC C/O RESURGENT CAPITAL SERVICES L vs LISA CHIN | |||||||||
15CVH01494 | MONTGOMERY COUNTY RESOURCE CENTE | 10/26/2015 | |||||||
ELLA KORN vs MONTGOMERY COUNTY RESOURCE CENTE | |||||||||
15CVH01492 | DON PETIT, REGISTAR | 10/26/2015 | |||||||
DARREN R BERGER vs DON PETIT, REGISTAR | |||||||||
15CVG01507 | JEFF HENRY | 10/26/2015 | |||||||
DOGWOOD PROPERTY INVESTMENTS, LLC vs JEFF HENRY | |||||||||
15CVG01488 | LOUISA SCHMOLINSKY, ET AL | 10/26/2015 | |||||||
10TH IN MIAMISBURG LLC BY: PEPZEE REALTY OF OHIO, INC. vs LOUISA SCHMOLINSKY, ET AL | |||||||||
15CVG01487 | RANDI INGLE, ET AL | 10/26/2015 | |||||||
DAYTON SPRING VALLEY PARTNERS, LTD. vs RANDI INGLE, ET AL | |||||||||
15CVG01486 | ABDULLAH ALQUARAISH, ET AL | 10/26/2015 | |||||||
TOWNE PROPERTIES DBA INDIAN LOOKOUT APARTMENTS vs ABDULLAH ALQUARAISH, ET AL | |||||||||
15CVF01506 | CASSANDRA J KING | 10/26/2015 | |||||||
CARROLLTON POINTE APARTMENTS vs CASSANDRA J KING | |||||||||
15CVE01493 | DAN OOTEN | 10/26/2015 | |||||||
REBECCA FLAUGHER vs DAN OOTEN | |||||||||
15CVE01483 | RISHI RAJ | 10/26/2015 | |||||||
JESSICA PASQUALE vs RISHI RAJ | |||||||||
15CVE01481 | AUSTIN BICE | 10/26/2015 | |||||||
STANLEY HAPER vs AUSTIN BICE | |||||||||
15CVG01475 | KERRI LEESON, ET AL. | 10/23/2015 | |||||||
KEVIN PAYNE vs KERRI LEESON, ET AL. | |||||||||
Previous 1, 2, 3 ... 614, 615, 616 ... 777, 778, 779 Next |