15571 Cases | Miamisburg Municipal New Suits
Case Number | Defendant | Date | |||||||
15CVI01623 | KOENIG EQUIPMENT INC. | 11/23/2015 | |||||||
RYAN COMBS vs KOENIG EQUIPMENT INC. | |||||||||
15CVI01625 | MILZY MOTORSPORTS C/O MICHAEL MILLER | 11/23/2015 | |||||||
KEVIN GARBER vs MILZY MOTORSPORTS C/O MICHAEL MILLER | |||||||||
15CVH01545 | DON PETIT, REGISTAR | 11/6/2015 | |||||||
ANNA M MAYS vs DON PETIT, REGISTAR | |||||||||
15CVH01544 | DON PETIT, REGISTAR | 11/5/2015 | |||||||
HAROLD M BELL vs DON PETIT, REGISTAR | |||||||||
15CVF01540 | TIFFANY GREER | 11/4/2015 | |||||||
MIDLAND FUNDING LLC DBI OHIO AS MIDLAND FUNDING DE L vs TIFFANY GREER | |||||||||
15CVF01542 | SANDRA E MYERS | 11/4/2015 | |||||||
DISCOVER BANK C/O DISCOVER PRODUCTS, INC. vs SANDRA E MYERS | |||||||||
15CVH01541 | DON PETIT, REGISTAR | 11/4/2015 | |||||||
TIMOTHY BAKER vs DON PETIT, REGISTAR | |||||||||
15CVH01543 | DON PETIT, REGISTAR | 11/4/2015 | |||||||
GLENN LAYMAN vs DON PETIT, REGISTAR | |||||||||
15CVG01535 | KATIE MCDONELL, ET AL | 11/3/2015 | |||||||
SUN COMMUNITIES OPERATING LIMITED PARTNERSHIP vs KATIE MCDONELL, ET AL | |||||||||
15CVG01536 | LARRY MCCANDLESS, ET AL | 11/3/2015 | |||||||
SUN COMMUNITIES OPERATING LIMITED PARTNERSHIP vs LARRY MCCANDLESS, ET AL | |||||||||
15CVE01525 | LAMON EDWARD WILSON | 11/2/2015 | |||||||
MAHAMAT SOULEYMAN-CHAVANEL vs LAMON EDWARD WILSON | |||||||||
Previous 1, 2, 3 ... 612, 613, 614 ... 777, 778, 779 Next |