15542 Cases | Miamisburg Municipal New Suits
Case Number | Defendant | Date | |||||||
16CVF00042 | ANGELA KLEIN | 1/12/2016 | |||||||
FA OHIO INC DBA FLOORING AMERICA DESIGN CENTER vs ANGELA KLEIN | |||||||||
16CVG00036 | ROBERT NEGRELLI, ET AL | 1/12/2016 | |||||||
TWINFIELD PROPERTIES, LLC vs ROBERT NEGRELLI, ET AL | |||||||||
16CVH00031 | DON PETIT, REGISTAR | 1/12/2016 | |||||||
EMILY MISER vs DON PETIT, REGISTAR | |||||||||
16CVI00030 | NATALIE ROSE | 1/12/2016 | |||||||
BANKS LAWN CARE, LLC JOHN BANKS II, OWNER vs NATALIE ROSE | |||||||||
16CVI00032 | ALICE BETTY MCKAY | 1/12/2016 | |||||||
SANNER FUNERAL HOME INC. vs ALICE BETTY MCKAY | |||||||||
16CVF00041 | GERALDINE MEDEIROS | 1/12/2016 | |||||||
FA OHIO INC DBA FLOORING AMERICA DESIGN CENTER vs GERALDINE MEDEIROS | |||||||||
16CVG00027 | ANGELA MARKS, ET AL | 1/11/2016 | |||||||
MEAFELIA B. PASCUAL vs ANGELA MARKS, ET AL | |||||||||
16CVG00026 | CHASE A. CLEMONS, ET AL | 1/11/2016 | |||||||
SIMMS MANAGEMENT CORPORATION MIAMI BLUFF APARTMENTS vs CHASE A. CLEMONS, ET AL | |||||||||
16CVG00025 | CHRISTOPHER W. MEYER JR., ET AL | 1/11/2016 | |||||||
THOMAS L. REAGAN DBA T.L.R. PROPERTIES vs CHRISTOPHER W. MEYER JR., ET AL | |||||||||
16CVG00023 | WANDA VONDERSTRASSE, ET AL | 1/11/2016 | |||||||
MARK HOUSEMAN vs WANDA VONDERSTRASSE, ET AL | |||||||||
16CVF00029 | KRISTINE JEFFERSON | 1/11/2016 | |||||||
EAGLE LOAN COMPANY OF OHIO, INC. vs KRISTINE JEFFERSON | |||||||||
16CVG00017 | LESLIE PAYTON, ET AL | 1/8/2016 | |||||||
DON M JOHNSON vs LESLIE PAYTON, ET AL | |||||||||
16CVH00019 | DON PETIT REGISTRAR | 1/8/2016 | |||||||
DAVID OSTENDORF vs DON PETIT REGISTRAR | |||||||||
16CVH00014 | DON PETIT REGISTRAR | 1/7/2016 | |||||||
JAMES R CRAWFORD vs DON PETIT REGISTRAR | |||||||||
16CVH00015 | DON PETIT, REGISTAR | 1/7/2016 | |||||||
JAMES S DUELL vs DON PETIT, REGISTAR | |||||||||
16CVH00016 | DON PETIT, REGISTAR | 1/7/2016 | |||||||
TARA K ROSE vs DON PETIT, REGISTAR | |||||||||
16CVF00022 | DOUGLAS A. ANDERSON | 1/6/2016 | |||||||
SPRINGLEAF FINANCIAL SERVICES OF OHIO, INC. vs DOUGLAS A. ANDERSON | |||||||||
16CVG00010 | PAUL MENKE, ET AL. | 1/6/2016 | |||||||
ROBERT RECK vs PAUL MENKE, ET AL. | |||||||||
16CVG00011 | JASON WEBB, ET AL | 1/6/2016 | |||||||
ROBERT RECK vs JASON WEBB, ET AL | |||||||||
Previous 1, 2, 3 ... 590, 591, 592 ... 776, 777, 778 Next |