15542 Cases | Miamisburg Municipal New Suits
Case Number | Defendant | Date | |||||||
16CVI00152 | DON BERRY | 2/9/2016 | |||||||
HOWARD T BROWN vs DON BERRY | |||||||||
16CVF00150 | ANTHONY STAMPER | 2/8/2016 | |||||||
CACH, LLC vs ANTHONY STAMPER | |||||||||
16CVG00141 | CINNAWORKS, LLC A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPA... | 2/8/2016 | |||||||
DAYTON MALL VENTURE, LLC A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY CO. vs CINNAWORKS, LLC A DELAWA... | |||||||||
16CVG00149 | DAWN SELLERS, ET AL. | 2/8/2016 | |||||||
CONSOLIDATED IV, LLC THE KNOLLS APARTMENTS vs DAWN SELLERS, ET AL. | |||||||||
16CVG00153 | ROBERT HULL, III, ET AL | 2/8/2016 | |||||||
CMC PROPERTIES MAPLE RUN vs ROBERT HULL, III, ET AL | |||||||||
16CVG00154 | AMANDA BUTLER, ET AL | 2/8/2016 | |||||||
CMC PROPERTIES MAPLE RUN vs AMANDA BUTLER, ET AL | |||||||||
16CVG00155 | TONYA ALEXANDER, ET AL | 2/8/2016 | |||||||
CMC PROPERTIES MAPLE RUN vs TONYA ALEXANDER, ET AL | |||||||||
16CVH00151 | DON PETIT REGISTRAR | 2/8/2016 | |||||||
TRACY YAHLE vs DON PETIT REGISTRAR | |||||||||
16CVI00138 | SLEEP NUMBER STORE MGR: KAREN MILLER | 2/5/2016 | |||||||
ROBERT RHEIN vs SLEEP NUMBER STORE MGR: KAREN MILLER | |||||||||
16CVI00140 | MORRIS PHILLIPS | 2/5/2016 | |||||||
DOUG MIZE vs MORRIS PHILLIPS | |||||||||
16CVH00139 | DON PETIT REGISTRAR | 2/5/2016 | |||||||
DOUGLAS W. LATEW vs DON PETIT REGISTRAR | |||||||||
16CVH00137 | DON PETIT, REGISTAR | 2/5/2016 | |||||||
ISMAEL R MELENDEZ vs DON PETIT, REGISTAR | |||||||||
16CVH00136 | DON PETIT, REGISTAR | 2/4/2016 | |||||||
WILLIAM C WAX vs DON PETIT, REGISTAR | |||||||||
16CVF00135 | STACEY GRIMM | 2/3/2016 | |||||||
MIDLAND FUNDING LLC vs STACEY GRIMM | |||||||||
16CVG00134 | SARAH BROWN | 2/3/2016 | |||||||
MIR ALI vs SARAH BROWN | |||||||||
16CVH00133 | DON PETIT REGISTRAR | 2/3/2016 | |||||||
DONALD DILLON vs DON PETIT REGISTRAR | |||||||||
16CVG00127 | ANTWAUN BROWN, ET AL | 2/2/2016 | |||||||
VINEBROOK HOMES OH, LLC vs ANTWAUN BROWN, ET AL | |||||||||
16CVG00128 | BRIAN JACKSON, ET AL | 2/2/2016 | |||||||
VINEBROOK HOMES OH, LLC vs BRIAN JACKSON, ET AL | |||||||||
16CVG00129 | JEREMY COOK, ET AL | 2/2/2016 | |||||||
SUN COMMUNITIES OPERATING LMTD PARTNERSHIP vs JEREMY COOK, ET AL | |||||||||
Previous 1, 2, 3 ... 585, 586, 587 ... 776, 777, 778 Next |