15571 Cases | Miamisburg Municipal New Suits
Case Number | Defendant | Date | |||||||
16CVG00263 | JOSHUA A. LONGSTRETH, ET AL | 2/29/2016 | |||||||
DAVID D. HICKS vs JOSHUA A. LONGSTRETH, ET AL | |||||||||
16CVH00264 | MARGARET M. OGORMAN | 2/29/2016 | |||||||
STATE OF OHIO DEPT. OF JOB & FAMILY SERVICES vs MARGARET M. OGORMAN | |||||||||
16CVH00266 | DON PETIT, REGISTAR | 2/29/2016 | |||||||
STEPHANIE DAY vs DON PETIT, REGISTAR | |||||||||
16CVG00260 | LUKE BAKER, ET AL. | 2/29/2016 | |||||||
ALMEDIA COURT, LLC vs LUKE BAKER, ET AL. | |||||||||
16CVI00252 | COESTER VMS | 2/26/2016 | |||||||
DAWN CLAYBORN vs COESTER VMS | |||||||||
16CVG00248 | DAWN SMITH, ET AL | 2/25/2016 | |||||||
SHOWE MANAGEMENT CORPORATION DBA COVEY RUN APARTMENTS vs DAWN SMITH, ET AL | |||||||||
16CVG00249 | KELLIE PRAYDIS, ET AL | 2/25/2016 | |||||||
SHOWE MANAGEMENT CORPORATION DBA COVEY RUN APARTMENTS vs KELLIE PRAYDIS, ET AL | |||||||||
16CVG00250 | CHRISTY KUHLEN, ET AL | 2/25/2016 | |||||||
SHOWE MANAGEMENT CORPORATION DBA COVEY RUN APARTMENTS vs CHRISTY KUHLEN, ET AL | |||||||||
16CVH00247 | DON PETIT REGISTRAR | 2/25/2016 | |||||||
DAKOTA PESEK vs DON PETIT REGISTRAR | |||||||||
16CVH00251 | DON PETIT, REGISTAR | 2/25/2016 | |||||||
TIMOTHY R JUSTICE vs DON PETIT, REGISTAR | |||||||||
16CVF00240 | TIFFANY C CRUM | 2/24/2016 | |||||||
CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A. C/O CHEEK LAW OFFICES, LLC vs TIFFANY C CRUM | |||||||||
16CVG00246 | JOHN KOWALSKI, ET AL. | 2/24/2016 | |||||||
AMH 2014-3 BORROWER, LLC vs JOHN KOWALSKI, ET AL. | |||||||||
16CVF00245 | AMBER A WILSON | 2/24/2016 | |||||||
MIDLAND FUNDING LLC DBI OHIO MIDLAND FUNDING DE LLC vs AMBER A WILSON | |||||||||
16CVF00244 | DANIEL N BRANDMEYER | 2/24/2016 | |||||||
DNF ASSOCIATES LLC C/O SLOVIN & ASSOCIATES CO., LPA vs DANIEL N BRANDMEYER | |||||||||
16CVF00243 | SUE HAMMERGREN | 2/24/2016 | |||||||
MIDLAND FUNDING LLC DBI OHIO MIDLAND FUNDING DE LLC vs SUE HAMMERGREN | |||||||||
16CVF00242 | ANGELA G. STIVER | 2/24/2016 | |||||||
DISCOVER BANK C/O ZWICKER & ASSOCIATES, P.C. vs ANGELA G. STIVER | |||||||||
16CVF00241 | ANGELA M. HAACKE | 2/24/2016 | |||||||
MIDLAND FUNDING LLC DBI OHIO MIDLAND FUNDING DE LLC vs ANGELA M. HAACKE | |||||||||
16CVF00226 | MICHAEL NADDRA, ET AL | 2/23/2016 | |||||||
MIDLAND FUNDING LLC DBI OHIO MIDLAND FUNDING DE LLC vs MICHAEL NADDRA, ET AL | |||||||||
16CVF00227 | JAMES CELEBUCKI | 2/23/2016 | |||||||
MIDLAND FUNDING LLC DBI OHIO MIDLAND FUNDING DE LLC vs JAMES CELEBUCKI | |||||||||
Previous 1, 2, 3 ... 582, 583, 584 ... 777, 778, 779 Next |