15571 Cases | Miamisburg Municipal New Suits
Case Number | Defendant | Date | |||||||
16CVG01051 | JUDY AMIS, ET AL | 7/25/2016 | |||||||
ALMEDIA COURT, LLC DBA MIAMISBURG GARDENS vs JUDY AMIS, ET AL | |||||||||
16CVG01050 | JUANITA PRESTON, ET AL | 7/25/2016 | |||||||
PAG HOLDINGS, LTD. vs JUANITA PRESTON, ET AL | |||||||||
16CVH01047 | DON PETIT, REGISTAR | 7/22/2016 | |||||||
TERESA L SHEPARD vs DON PETIT, REGISTAR | |||||||||
16CVE01044 | BRITTON K. SOUTHERS | 7/21/2016 | |||||||
STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INS. CO. vs BRITTON K. SOUTHERS | |||||||||
16CVH01045 | DON PETIT, REGISTAR | 7/21/2016 | |||||||
KANISHA I MOHANNA vs DON PETIT, REGISTAR | |||||||||
16CVI01046 | MENARDS | 7/21/2016 | |||||||
DWAYNE EDWARDS vs MENARDS | |||||||||
16CVG01034 | NEFTI RIVERA, ET AL | 7/20/2016 | |||||||
ROSS RENTALS JOHN T. ROSS-OWNER vs NEFTI RIVERA, ET AL | |||||||||
16CVI01026 | MARCUS BROADNAX | 7/20/2016 | |||||||
MIAMISBURG MUNICIPAL COURT C/O AMANDA ZENNIE, CLERK OF COUR vs MARCUS BROADNAX | |||||||||
16CVH01027 | DON PETIT, REGISTAR | 7/20/2016 | |||||||
JAINA J PIOVESAN vs DON PETIT, REGISTAR | |||||||||
16CVG01033 | ALEX CONWAY, ET AL | 7/20/2016 | |||||||
PLAZA MIAMISBURG, LLC vs ALEX CONWAY, ET AL | |||||||||
16CVG01032 | BILLITH J. LANE, ET AL | 7/20/2016 | |||||||
PLAZA MIAMISBURG, LLC vs BILLITH J. LANE, ET AL | |||||||||
16CVF01028 | BRETT HOLDEMAN | 7/20/2016 | |||||||
MIDLAND FUNDING LLC DBI OHIO AS MIDLAND FUNDING DE LLC vs BRETT HOLDEMAN | |||||||||
16CVF01024 | MICHAEL BERKE | 7/20/2016 | |||||||
PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC vs MICHAEL BERKE | |||||||||
16CVF01041 | ROBERT GRIFFIN | 7/19/2016 | |||||||
LVNV FUNDING LLC vs ROBERT GRIFFIN | |||||||||
16CVF01042 | COREY L MUSGROVE | 7/19/2016 | |||||||
DISCOVER BANK C/O DISCOVER PRODUCTS, INC. vs COREY L MUSGROVE | |||||||||
16CVF01043 | JOYCE TURNER | 7/19/2016 | |||||||
DISCOVER BANK C/O DISCOVER PRODUCTS, INC. vs JOYCE TURNER | |||||||||
16CVG01016 | CHARLES ANDERSON, ET AL | 7/19/2016 | |||||||
ARNOLD SMITH vs CHARLES ANDERSON, ET AL | |||||||||
16CVG01017 | KIMBERLY PRICE, ET AL | 7/19/2016 | |||||||
DAYTON SPRING VALLEY PARTNERS, LTD. vs KIMBERLY PRICE, ET AL | |||||||||
16CVG01018 | ACACIA DOLIBOA, ET AL | 7/19/2016 | |||||||
K&E PROPERTY MANAGEMENT FOR: NJ DILLER FAMILY TRUST LLC vs ACACIA DOLIBOA, ET AL | |||||||||
Previous 1, 2, 3 ... 540, 541, 542 ... 777, 778, 779 Next |