15591 Cases | Miamisburg Municipal New Suits
Case Number | Defendant | Date | |||||||
16CVF01116 | LARONDA HAYES | 8/5/2016 | |||||||
PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC vs LARONDA HAYES | |||||||||
16CVF01115 | JENNIFER D JONES | 8/5/2016 | |||||||
PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC vs JENNIFER D JONES | |||||||||
16CVF01111 | GARY HOBBS | 8/4/2016 | |||||||
MERCHANTS FINANCIAL SERVICES INC vs GARY HOBBS | |||||||||
16CVH01108 | DON PETIT, REGISTAR | 8/4/2016 | |||||||
WILLIAM G LIAS vs DON PETIT, REGISTAR | |||||||||
16CVH01109 | DON PETIT, REGISTAR | 8/4/2016 | |||||||
COREY J PUTHOFF vs DON PETIT, REGISTAR | |||||||||
16CVI01110 | DOUG BELL | 8/4/2016 | |||||||
HILDA STEWART vs DOUG BELL | |||||||||
16CVI01112 | AMBER KNOX | 8/4/2016 | |||||||
MAKAN PROPERTIES LLC CONNIE-MANAGER vs AMBER KNOX | |||||||||
16CVF01106 | BRITTANY RICHEY | 8/3/2016 | |||||||
PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC vs BRITTANY RICHEY | |||||||||
16CVI01105 | LOVELL WILLIAMSON | 8/3/2016 | |||||||
KIMBERLY CRUTCHER vs LOVELL WILLIAMSON | |||||||||
16CVG01102 | JASMINE THOMPSON, ET AL. | 8/3/2016 | |||||||
EAGLE RIDGE APARTMENTS C/O SUNDANCE PROPERTY MANAGEMENT vs JASMINE THOMPSON, ET AL. | |||||||||
16CVG01100 | SAMANTHA SHEARER, ET AL. | 8/3/2016 | |||||||
ARLINGTON VILLAGE APARTMENTS, LL vs SAMANTHA SHEARER, ET AL. | |||||||||
16CVF01104 | FREDERICK PAUGH | 8/3/2016 | |||||||
SECOND ROUND SUB, LLC. C/O LEVY & ASSOCIATES, LLC vs FREDERICK PAUGH | |||||||||
16CVF01103 | MATTHEW WORKMAN | 8/3/2016 | |||||||
PIONEER SERVICES A DIVISION OF MIDCOUNTRY BANK vs MATTHEW WORKMAN | |||||||||
16CVF01101 | LUTHER JOHNSON | 8/3/2016 | |||||||
BANK OF AMERICA, N.A. vs LUTHER JOHNSON | |||||||||
16CVG01092 | JOHNNY MCDANIEL, ET AL | 8/2/2016 | |||||||
SUN SECURED FINANCING, LLC DBA OAKWOOD VILLAGE vs JOHNNY MCDANIEL, ET AL | |||||||||
16CVG01093 | KYLE SIPPLE, ET AL | 8/2/2016 | |||||||
SUN SECURED FINANCING, LLC DBA OAKWOOD VILLAGE vs KYLE SIPPLE, ET AL | |||||||||
16CVF01094 | GLORIA MARTOS | 8/1/2016 | |||||||
ROSS RENTALS vs GLORIA MARTOS | |||||||||
16CVF01095 | DAVID HOWARD | 8/1/2016 | |||||||
MIDLAND FUNDING LLC DBI OHIO AS MIDLAND FUNDING DE LLC vs DAVID HOWARD | |||||||||
16CVF01096 | JULIE A. CAMPBELL | 8/1/2016 | |||||||
CAPTIAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A. C/O CHEEK LAW OFFICES, LLC vs JULIE A. CAMPBELL | |||||||||
Previous 1, 2, 3 ... 538, 539, 540 ... 778, 779, 780 Next |