15460 Cases | Miamisburg Municipal New Suits
Case Number | Defendant | Date | |||||||
16CVG01076 | BRIAN SIMPSON, ET AL. | 7/27/2016 | |||||||
TOWNE PROPERTIES DBA CENTERVILLE PARK APARTMENTS vs BRIAN SIMPSON, ET AL. | |||||||||
16CVG01078 | HEATHER SINCLAIR, ET AL | 7/27/2016 | |||||||
TOWNE PROPERTIES DBA CENTERVILLE PARK APARTMENTS vs HEATHER SINCLAIR, ET AL | |||||||||
16CVG01074 | TAYLOR PORTER, EL AL. | 7/27/2016 | |||||||
TOWNE PROPERTIES DBA CENTERVILLE PARK APARTMENTS vs TAYLOR PORTER, EL AL. | |||||||||
16CVG01060 | ELI CRAFT, ET AL | 7/26/2016 | |||||||
TOWNE PROPERTIES DBA CENTERVILLE PARK APTS., LLC vs ELI CRAFT, ET AL | |||||||||
16CVH01049 | DON PETIT REGISTRAR | 7/26/2016 | |||||||
KEAON DASHAWN SHEPHARD vs DON PETIT REGISTRAR | |||||||||
16CVG01059 | DIANE COOK, ET AL | 7/26/2016 | |||||||
TOWNE PROPERTIES DBA CENTERVILLE PARK APTS., LLC vs DIANE COOK, ET AL | |||||||||
16CVG01058 | ISMAEL CLAUDIO, ET AL. | 7/26/2016 | |||||||
TOWNE PROPERTIES DBA CENTERVILLE PARK APTS., LLC vs ISMAEL CLAUDIO, ET AL. | |||||||||
16CVG01057 | SAEED ALQARNI, ET AL | 7/26/2016 | |||||||
TOWNE PROPERTIES DBA CENTERVILLE PARK APTS., LLC vs SAEED ALQARNI, ET AL | |||||||||
16CVG01056 | ZACH ADDISON, ET AL | 7/26/2016 | |||||||
TOWNE PROPERTIES DBA CENTERVILLE PARK APTS., LLC vs ZACH ADDISON, ET AL | |||||||||
16CVG01052 | JAMIE SHANNON, ET AL | 7/26/2016 | |||||||
AH4R-OH, LLC vs JAMIE SHANNON, ET AL | |||||||||
16CVG01048 | JASON T. KIMMEL, ET AL. | 7/26/2016 | |||||||
LESLIE H. GRUBB vs JASON T. KIMMEL, ET AL. | |||||||||
16CVF01075 | YVONNE M. CONLEY | 7/26/2016 | |||||||
CREDIT ACCEPTANCE CORP. C/O LEVY & ASSOCIATES, LLC vs YVONNE M. CONLEY | |||||||||
16CVF01068 | HOLLY J. DIFLORA | 7/25/2016 | |||||||
CBCS vs HOLLY J. DIFLORA | |||||||||
16CVF01070 | JASON L. FOX | 7/25/2016 | |||||||
CBCS vs JASON L. FOX | |||||||||
16CVF01072 | SHAUNA WEIBLE | 7/25/2016 | |||||||
TROY CAPITAL, LLC ASIGNEE OF SOUTHEAST FINANCIAL CREDIT UNION vs SHAUNA WEIBLE | |||||||||
16CVG01050 | JUANITA PRESTON, ET AL | 7/25/2016 | |||||||
PAG HOLDINGS, LTD. vs JUANITA PRESTON, ET AL | |||||||||
16CVG01051 | JUDY AMIS, ET AL | 7/25/2016 | |||||||
ALMEDIA COURT, LLC DBA MIAMISBURG GARDENS vs JUDY AMIS, ET AL | |||||||||
16CVH01047 | DON PETIT, REGISTAR | 7/22/2016 | |||||||
TERESA L SHEPARD vs DON PETIT, REGISTAR | |||||||||
16CVE01044 | BRITTON K. SOUTHERS | 7/21/2016 | |||||||
STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INS. CO. vs BRITTON K. SOUTHERS | |||||||||
Previous 1, 2, 3 ... 533, 534, 535 ... 771, 772, 773 Next |