15571 Cases | Miamisburg Municipal New Suits
Case Number | Defendant | Date | |||||||
16CVF01562 | ALICE SLATON | 11/1/2016 | |||||||
ONEMAIN FINANCIAL OF OHIO, INC., vs ALICE SLATON | |||||||||
16CVF01563 | AARON M GUERNSEY | 11/1/2016 | |||||||
CARROLLTON POINTE APARTMENTS vs AARON M GUERNSEY | |||||||||
16CVF01565 | RONALD N GRIGGS | 11/1/2016 | |||||||
BARCLAYS BANK DELAWARE C/O LEVY & ASSOCIATES, LLC vs RONALD N GRIGGS | |||||||||
16CVF01567 | SHERYL A. SPICER | 11/1/2016 | |||||||
PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC vs SHERYL A. SPICER | |||||||||
16CVG01559 | MICHAEL ROBERTS, ET. AL | 11/1/2016 | |||||||
RAY OVERHOLSER vs MICHAEL ROBERTS, ET. AL | |||||||||
16CVG01566 | KATHLEEN MCGUINNESS, ET. AL | 11/1/2016 | |||||||
CMC PROPERTIES vs KATHLEEN MCGUINNESS, ET. AL | |||||||||
16CVF01561 | DAVID L. HAMBY | 11/1/2016 | |||||||
NATIONAL CREDIT ADJUSTERS vs DAVID L. HAMBY | |||||||||
16CVG01558 | LEEANN ENGEL, ET AL. | 10/31/2016 | |||||||
BRITTANY NICOLE JEWELL vs LEEANN ENGEL, ET AL. | |||||||||
16CVH01546 | DON PETIT, REGISTAR | 10/28/2016 | |||||||
AJAY PATEL vs DON PETIT, REGISTAR | |||||||||
16CVH01549 | DON PETIT, REGISTAR | 10/28/2016 | |||||||
RAYMOND P MILLER vs DON PETIT, REGISTAR | |||||||||
16CVH01548 | DON PETIT REGISTRAR | 10/28/2016 | |||||||
JAMES S FINSTER vs DON PETIT REGISTRAR | |||||||||
16CVF01547 | ROGER KOUGHER | 10/28/2016 | |||||||
JEFF LAY vs ROGER KOUGHER | |||||||||
16CVF01544 | DOMINQUE COLLINS | 10/27/2016 | |||||||
CREATIVE IMAGES INSTITUTE OF COS C/O SLOVIN & ASSOCIATES CO. LPA vs DOMINQUE COL... | |||||||||
16CVF01545 | TYLER MCDANIEL | 10/27/2016 | |||||||
MIDLAND FUNDING LLC DBI OHIO AS MIDLAND FUNDING DE LLC vs TYLER MCDANIEL | |||||||||
16CVG01542 | ASHLEY SEWARD, ET. AL | 10/27/2016 | |||||||
STEVE KRENNING vs ASHLEY SEWARD, ET. AL | |||||||||
16CVI01543 | VICTORIA BLAKE | 10/27/2016 | |||||||
SANDY OTERO vs VICTORIA BLAKE | |||||||||
16CVF01535 | MICHAEL D VANDERHORST | 10/26/2016 | |||||||
CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA) N.A. C/O CHEEK LAW OFFICES, LLC vs MICHAEL D VANDERHORST | |||||||||
16CVG01537 | SAEED ALQARNI, ET AL | 10/26/2016 | |||||||
TOWNE PROPERTIES DBA CENTERVILLE PARK APTS., LLC vs SAEED ALQARNI, ET AL | |||||||||
Previous 1, 2, 3 ... 514, 515, 516 ... 777, 778, 779 Next |