Daily Law Journal
10680 Cases | Miamisburg Municipal New Suits
Case Number Defendant Date
13CVF01895 JIMMY WILSON 12/16/2013
CREDIT ACCEPTANCE CORP vs JIMMY WILSON
13CVH01890 MIKE RANKIN REGISTRAR 12/16/2013
ANDREW SWORD vs MIKE RANKIN REGISTRAR
13CVF01894 CHRISTY THOMPSON 12/16/2013
MIDLAND FUNDING LLC DBA IN OHIO MIDLAND FUNDING DE vs CHRISTY THOMPSON
13CVG01887 TONYA MACIK 12/13/2013
VIC GREEN REALTY PROPERTY MANAGEMENT vs TONYA MACIK
13CVG01889 DIRK ROGERS 12/13/2013
PAG HOLDINGS, LTD. vs DIRK ROGERS
13CVH01888 MIKE RANKIN REGISTRAR 12/13/2013
JOE D STEPHENS vs MIKE RANKIN REGISTRAR
13CVG01886 MATTHEW HASTINGS, ET AL. 12/12/2013
ROGER WRAY vs MATTHEW HASTINGS, ET AL.
13CVH01883 MIKE RANKIN REGISTRAR 12/12/2013
ANTHONY WIFORD vs MIKE RANKIN REGISTRAR
13CVH01884 MIKE RANKIN REGISTRAR 12/12/2013
NICHOLAS S RICE vs MIKE RANKIN REGISTRAR
13CVH01885 MIKE RANKIN REGISTRAR 12/12/2013
CAMILLE R HUMPHREY vs MIKE RANKIN REGISTRAR
13CVF01882 CHAD BURNS 12/12/2013
CREDIT ACCEPTANCE CORP vs CHAD BURNS
13CVF01881 SALAH ARRIB 12/11/2013
CROWN ASSET MANAGEMENT LLC C/O LEVY & ASSOCIATES vs SALAH ARRIB
13CVH01876 MIKE RANKIN REG 12/11/2013
JESSICA M HARLOW vs MIKE RANKIN REG
13CVI01880 GLORIA GREENLEE 12/11/2013
RICK'S FOREIGN EXCHANGE CO. RICHARD REILICH, PRESIDENT vs GLORIA GREENLEE
13CVF01875 VERA L. GOMES 12/10/2013
ONEMAIN FINANCIAL, INC. vs VERA L. GOMES
13CVF01877 PHILIP DEMMONS 12/10/2013
MIDLAND FUNDING LLC DBA IN OHIO MIDLAND FUNDING DE vs PHILIP DEMMONS
13CVF01878 CAROL S. MUSTARD 12/10/2013
CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA) N.A. vs CAROL S. MUSTARD
13CVF01879 MEGAN N. GUARD 12/10/2013
CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA) N.A. C/O CHEEK LAW OFFICES, LLC vs MEGAN N. GUARD
13CVG01872 RHAPSODI BENNETT, ET AL. 12/10/2013
BERKSHIRE REALTY GROUP, LLC WOODHILLS APARTMENTS vs RHAPSODI BENNETT, ET AL.

Previous  1, 2, 3 ... 510, 511, 512 ... 532, 533, 534  Next