Daily Law Journal
10177 Cases | Miamisburg Municipal New Suits
Case Number Defendant Date
13CVG01404 KATRINA ALSEPT, ET AL. 9/16/2013
PAT CLARK vs KATRINA ALSEPT, ET AL.
13CVG01406 TINA R. CLAYTON, ET AL. 9/16/2013
ROSS RENTALS vs TINA R. CLAYTON, ET AL.
13CVG01407 HEATHER MOYER, ET AL. 9/16/2013
VIC GREEN REALTY PROPERTY MANAGEMENT vs HEATHER MOYER, ET AL.
13CVH01405 MIKE RANKIN 9/16/2013
MARK A RAFFMAN vs MIKE RANKIN
13CVI01403 YVONNE WILLIAMS 9/16/2013
GEORGE A. BERRY vs YVONNE WILLIAMS
13CVF01402 KERRY A CROSS 9/13/2013
FFIF - ACM OPPORTUNITY FUND LLC ASSIGNEE OF HSBC CARD SERVICES, vs KERRY A CROSS
13CVG01399 ASHLEY NEUBURG, ET AL. 9/13/2013
LISA M. LOPEZ vs ASHLEY NEUBURG, ET AL.
13CVH01400 MIKE RANKIN, REG 9/13/2013
KIMBERLY L BANKS vs MIKE RANKIN, REG
13CVF01401 MICHAEL A PRICE 9/13/2013
CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), NA vs MICHAEL A PRICE
13CVI01397 MICHAEL CLOUSE 9/12/2013
SETTLERS WALK HOME OWNERS ASSOC. C/O ASSOCIA/CMS vs MICHAEL CLOUSE
13CVI01398 TYSON WIGGINS 9/12/2013
SETTLERS WALK HOME OWNERS ASSOC. C/O ASSOCIA/CMS vs TYSON WIGGINS
13CVG01394 GAIL WEST 9/12/2013
JESSE H BURCHETT vs GAIL WEST
13CVG01395 HEATHER MURPHY, ET AL 9/12/2013
SHOWE MANAGEMENT CORP vs HEATHER MURPHY, ET AL
13CVG01396 DARRELL VIA 9/12/2013
D. KENT SOUTHARD vs DARRELL VIA
13CVF01391 TONYA K STUNICH 9/11/2013
CBCS vs TONYA K STUNICH
13CVF01392 AMY D DAVIS 9/11/2013
CBCS vs AMY D DAVIS
13CVF01393 KELLIE R KESSACK 9/11/2013
CBCS vs KELLIE R KESSACK
13CVH01390 MIKE RANKIN REGISTRAR 9/11/2013
JARED L COLLINS vs MIKE RANKIN REGISTRAR
13CVG01388 JUSTIN HANSON, ET AL 9/10/2013
THOMAS L REAGAN vs JUSTIN HANSON, ET AL

Previous  1, 2, 3 ... 507, 508, 509