Daily Law Journal
10177 Cases | Miamisburg Municipal New Suits
Case Number Defendant Date
13CVG01432 CHRISTINA STEVENSON, ET AL. 9/20/2013
PROPERTY MANAGEMENT REAL ESTATE SOLUTIONS UNLIMITED vs CHRISTINA STEVENSON, ET AL.
13CVG01429 QUINN BACHMAN 9/20/2013
AUTUMN WOODS APARTMENTS vs QUINN BACHMAN
13CVG01430 WILLIAM BURTON, ET AL. 9/20/2013
HIDDEN LAKES APARTMENTS vs WILLIAM BURTON, ET AL.
13CVG01431 WILLIE TEMPLETON, ET AL. 9/20/2013
HIDDEN LAKES APARTMENTS vs WILLIE TEMPLETON, ET AL.
13CVG01418 ELISA WELBAUM, ET AL 9/19/2013
MAD RIVER APARTMENTS vs ELISA WELBAUM, ET AL
13CVF01419 TONYA GILMORE 9/19/2013
PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, L vs TONYA GILMORE
13CVF01420 IRENE H. BARR 9/19/2013
PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOC., LLC vs IRENE H. BARR
13CVF01421 SHERYL MCDONALD 9/19/2013
PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOC., LLC vs SHERYL MCDONALD
13CVF01422 EMMANUEL NIYIBIZI 9/19/2013
PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOC., LLC vs EMMANUEL NIYIBIZI
13CVF01423 LINDA LAMBERT 9/19/2013
DISCOVER BANK C/O DB SERVICING CORPORATION vs LINDA LAMBERT
13CVG01417 TALANA PERRY, ET AL. 9/19/2013
MAD RIVER APARTMENTS vs TALANA PERRY, ET AL.
13CVF01413 SIDNEY POLK 9/18/2013
NATIONAL RECOVERY SOLUTIONS, LLC C/O LEVY & ASSOCIATES, LLC vs SIDNEY POLK
13CVF01414 TIA WAGNER 9/18/2013
CAVALRY SPV I, LLC C/O LEVY & ASSOCIATES, LLC vs TIA WAGNER
13CVG01416 ELIZABETH KRONK 9/18/2013
JESSE H BURCHETT vs ELIZABETH KRONK
13CVH01415 JACK FLANAGAN 9/18/2013
GERALD D. SHUMAKER vs JACK FLANAGAN
13CVG01411 CHARLES CHAPMAN 9/17/2013
DAYTON SPRING VALLEY PARTNERS, LTD. vs CHARLES CHAPMAN
13CVG01412 AMBER HENDLEY, ET AL. 9/17/2013
DAYTON SPRING VALLEY PARTNERS, LTD. vs AMBER HENDLEY, ET AL.
13CVG01410 KAREN MOHARTER, ET AL 9/17/2013
DAYTON SPRING VALLEY PARTNERS LT DBA PRESERVE AT SAGEBROOK vs KAREN MOHARTER, ET AL
13CVF01408 CRYSTAL L. POTTS 9/16/2013
WRIGHT-PATT CREDIT UNION vs CRYSTAL L. POTTS

Previous  1, 2, 3 ... , 507, 508, 509  Next