15591 Cases | Miamisburg Municipal New Suits
Case Number | Defendant | Date | |||||||
16CVF01843 | RAYMOND M. BELL | 12/27/2016 | |||||||
PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOC., LLC ASSIGNEE OF CITIBANK, N.A. vs RAYMOND M. BELL | |||||||||
16CVF01844 | JESSICA MADLENER | 12/27/2016 | |||||||
CREATIVE IMAGES INSTITUTE OF COS C/O SLOVIN & ASSOC. CO. LPA vs JESSICA MADLENER | |||||||||
16CVG01828 | MOHAMMED AL-MAQBOUL, ET. AL | 12/27/2016 | |||||||
EDWARD ROSE ASSOC., L.L.C. DBA AUTUMN WOODS APTS. vs MOHAMMED AL-MAQBOUL, ET. AL | |||||||||
16CVG01829 | AMY BAKER, ET. AL | 12/27/2016 | |||||||
HIDDEN LAKES ASSOCIATES, LLC DBA HIDDEN LAKES APARTMENTS vs AMY BAKER, ET. AL | |||||||||
16CVG01830 | DEANDRE PARKER, ET. AL | 12/27/2016 | |||||||
EDWARD ROSE ASSOC., L.L.C. DBA AUTUMN WOODS APTS. vs DEANDRE PARKER, ET. AL | |||||||||
16CVG01831 | NIESSHA SKELTON, ET AL. | 12/27/2016 | |||||||
GENE B. GLICK CO., INC DBA SPRING HILL APARTMENTS vs NIESSHA SKELTON, ET AL. | |||||||||
16CVG01832 | MARY LYNCH, ET. AL | 12/27/2016 | |||||||
SUNDANCE PROPERTY MANAGMENT, INC DBA EAGLE RIDGE APARTMENTS vs MARY LYNCH, ET. AL | |||||||||
16CVF01842 | DONETTE HARTZELL | 12/27/2016 | |||||||
CBCS vs DONETTE HARTZELL | |||||||||
16CVH01819 | DON PETIT | 12/22/2016 | |||||||
HEATH ALDERMAN vs DON PETIT | |||||||||
16CVH01818 | DON PETIT, REGISTAR | 12/21/2016 | |||||||
KOSIMA G IHSSEN vs DON PETIT, REGISTAR | |||||||||
16CVG01803 | JAMIE SHANNON, ET AL | 12/20/2016 | |||||||
AH4R-OH, LLC vs JAMIE SHANNON, ET AL | |||||||||
16CVH01811 | DON PETIT REGISTRAR | 12/20/2016 | |||||||
JAMES R HEAPS vs DON PETIT REGISTRAR | |||||||||
16CVH01809 | DON PETIT REGISTRAR | 12/20/2016 | |||||||
JESSICA R STINE vs DON PETIT REGISTRAR | |||||||||
16CVG01817 | LEAH EICK, ET AL. | 12/20/2016 | |||||||
B&L ENTERPRISES C/O J. DAVID LUCKHAUPT, AGENT vs LEAH EICK, ET AL. | |||||||||
16CVG01805 | JOHN KOWALSKI, ET AL. | 12/20/2016 | |||||||
AMH 2014-3 BORROWER, LLC vs JOHN KOWALSKI, ET AL. | |||||||||
16CVG01804 | CORY PRUITT, ET. AL | 12/20/2016 | |||||||
AMH 2014-3 BORROWER, LLC vs CORY PRUITT, ET. AL | |||||||||
16CVF01806 | ALAN THACKER | 12/19/2016 | |||||||
CAVALRY SPV I, LLC vs ALAN THACKER | |||||||||
16CVF01807 | JENA L. REED | 12/19/2016 | |||||||
UNIVERSAL 1 CREDIT UNION INC. vs JENA L. REED | |||||||||
16CVF01808 | JAM L. COX, AKA JANICE L. COX | 12/19/2016 | |||||||
PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOC, LLC ASSIGNEE OF CITIBANK, N.A. SEARS vs JAM L. COX, AKA JAN... | |||||||||
Previous 1, 2, 3 ... 502, 503, 504 ... 778, 779, 780 Next |