9226 Cases | Miamisburg Municipal Judgements
Case Number | Defendant | Date | |||||||
CVF2301108 | FISHER, ANOTHNY P | 3/19/2024 | |||||||
MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT INC vs FISHER, ANOTHNY P | |||||||||
CVF2400044 | MARONE, IBRAHIM S. | 3/19/2024 | |||||||
CAMPHILL WAY, LLC vs MARONE, IBRAHIM S. | |||||||||
CVF2301444 | THAJEB, SALMA | 3/19/2024 | |||||||
CITIBANK, N.A. vs THAJEB, SALMA | |||||||||
CVF2301619 | VICROY, BRIAN | 3/19/2024 | |||||||
CKS PRIME INVESTMENTS, LLC vs VICROY, BRIAN | |||||||||
CVF2301719 | BALLARD, ZACHARY T | 3/19/2024 | |||||||
SYNCHRONY BANK vs BALLARD, ZACHARY T | |||||||||
CVG2400346 | YEARY, JORDAN | 3/19/2024 | |||||||
MIMG CLXXI vs YEARY, JORDAN | |||||||||
CVF2201620 | BAKER, NEIL C | 3/19/2024 | |||||||
MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT INC vs BAKER, NEIL C | |||||||||
CVF2301659 | GENTRY, SHERRI | 3/19/2024 | |||||||
MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT INC vs GENTRY, SHERRI | |||||||||
CVF2301642 | CAULLEY, ALEXANDER S | 3/19/2024 | |||||||
CITIBANK, N.A. vs CAULLEY, ALEXANDER S | |||||||||
CVG2400317 | DEWEY, OLIVIA | 3/19/2024 | |||||||
VINEBROOK HOMES, LLC vs DEWEY, OLIVIA | |||||||||
CVF2400105 | DAMRON, PATRICIA | 3/15/2024 | |||||||
MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT INC vs DAMRON, PATRICIA | |||||||||
CVF2301398 | COOPER, JESSICA | 3/15/2024 | |||||||
AMERICAN EXPRESS NATIONAL BANK vs COOPER, JESSICA | |||||||||
CVG2400310 | PAGE, STEPHANIE | 3/14/2024 | |||||||
FOCUS PM LLC vs PAGE, STEPHANIE | |||||||||
CVF2400350 | VADEN, JEFFREY | 3/13/2024 | |||||||
AMERICAN EXPRESS NATIONAL BANK vs VADEN, JEFFREY | |||||||||
CVF2300577 | BOWERS, ERIC | 3/12/2024 | |||||||
LVNV FUNDING, LLC vs BOWERS, ERIC | |||||||||
CVF2300342 | HALL, PATRICIA | 3/12/2024 | |||||||
LVNV FUNDING LLC vs HALL, PATRICIA | |||||||||
CVF2300345 | HALL, PATRICIA | 3/12/2024 | |||||||
LVNV FUNDING, LLC vs HALL, PATRICIA | |||||||||
CVF2300573 | WILSON, TYNEASHA L | 3/12/2024 | |||||||
LVNV FUNDING, LLC vs WILSON, TYNEASHA L | |||||||||
CVF2301199 | HART, SETH R | 3/12/2024 | |||||||
FAMILY HEALTH SERVICES vs HART, SETH R | |||||||||
Previous 1, 2, 3, 4, 5, 6 ... 460, 461, 462 Next |