9246 Cases | Miamisburg Municipal Judgements
Case Number | Defendant | Date | |||||||
16CVF01114 | CHRISTOPHER STEVENS | 11/14/2016 | |||||||
MIDLAND FUNDING LLC DBI OHIO AS MIDLAND FUNDING DE LLC vs CHRISTOPHER STEVENS | |||||||||
16CVF01237 | RHONDA A. HESS | 11/14/2016 | |||||||
CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A. vs RHONDA A. HESS | |||||||||
16CVF01367 | MATTHEW S. EVERETTS | 11/14/2016 | |||||||
STATE OF OHIO, DEPARTMENT OF JOB AND FAMILY SERVICES vs MATTHEW S. EVERETTS | |||||||||
16CVF00856 | JAMES R. NADEAU | 11/14/2016 | |||||||
PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC vs JAMES R. NADEAU | |||||||||
08CVH02058 | ELIZABETH E PATRICK | 11/9/2016 | |||||||
CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA) N.A. FKA CAPITAL ONE BANK vs ELIZABETH E PATRICK | |||||||||
16CVI00904 | CHRIS HIBBIT | 11/8/2016 | |||||||
HOCHSTEIN ENTERPRISES LLC vs CHRIS HIBBIT | |||||||||
16CVG01515 | LAUREN EVERSOLE, ET. AL | 11/8/2016 | |||||||
SUN SECURED FINANCING, LLC. DBA OAKWOOD VILLAGE vs LAUREN EVERSOLE, ET. AL | |||||||||
16CVG01513 | MICHAEL SMITH, ET. AL | 11/8/2016 | |||||||
SUN SECURED FINANCING, LLC. DBA OAKWOOD VILLAGE vs MICHAEL SMITH, ET. AL | |||||||||
16CVF01485 | ROBERT L JOHNSON | 11/8/2016 | |||||||
CBCS vs ROBERT L JOHNSON | |||||||||
16CVF01095 | DAVID HOWARD | 11/8/2016 | |||||||
MIDLAND FUNDING LLC DBI OHIO AS MIDLAND FUNDING DE LLC vs DAVID HOWARD | |||||||||
16CVF01041 | ROBERT GRIFFIN | 11/8/2016 | |||||||
LVNV FUNDING LLC vs ROBERT GRIFFIN | |||||||||
16CVF00450 | MARY THACKER | 11/4/2016 | |||||||
PREFERRED LOANS LLC DBA TL MAX vs MARY THACKER | |||||||||
16CVF00573 | MICHAEL HANKS AKA MICHAEL A. HANKS | 11/3/2016 | |||||||
CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A. C/O CHEEK LAW OFFICES, LLC vs MICHAEL HANKS AKA MICHAEL... | |||||||||
16CVF00654 | LAKESHIA HUNTLEY | 11/3/2016 | |||||||
JEFFERSON CAPITAL SYSTEMS, LLC vs LAKESHIA HUNTLEY | |||||||||
16CVF00888 | KELLY SALES | 11/3/2016 | |||||||
UNIVERSAL 1 CREDIT UNION INC. vs KELLY SALES | |||||||||
16CVF00907 | CHRISTY L. HAVENS AKA CHRISTY TOBIAS | 11/3/2016 | |||||||
PETERMILL ENTERPRISES, INC., T/A RSS DISTRIBUTORS vs CHRISTY L. HAVENS AKA CHRISTY TO... | |||||||||
16CVF01085 | JOHN SMITH | 11/3/2016 | |||||||
STERLING JEWELERS INC. T/A JARED-GALLERIA OF JEWELRY vs JOHN SMITH | |||||||||
16CVF01165 | DANIEL SHINE | 11/3/2016 | |||||||
RAZOR CAPITAL, LLC vs DANIEL SHINE | |||||||||
16CVF00145 | TAMBRIA S. ACKERMAN | 11/1/2016 | |||||||
CAVALRY SPV I, LLC vs TAMBRIA S. ACKERMAN | |||||||||
Previous 1, 2, 3 ... 386, 387, 388 ... 461, 462, 463 Next |