9246 Cases | Miamisburg Municipal Judgements
Case Number | Defendant | Date | |||||||
16CVF01408 | EVELYN R SWEENEY | 12/1/2016 | |||||||
SECURITY NATIONAL BANK, DIVISION OF THE PARK NATIONAL BA vs EVELYN R SWEENEY | |||||||||
16CVF00984 | JEANIE HANSHELL | 11/29/2016 | |||||||
PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC vs JEANIE HANSHELL | |||||||||
16CVF01315 | RANDOLPH WRAY (AKA RANDY B WRAY) | 11/29/2016 | |||||||
BROOKS CHARLTON vs RANDOLPH WRAY (AKA RANDY B WRAY) | |||||||||
16CVF01327 | RAYMOND D SCHOOLER | 11/29/2016 | |||||||
CAVALRY SPV I, LLC vs RAYMOND D SCHOOLER | |||||||||
16CVF01507 | NEELY A HAWKINS | 11/29/2016 | |||||||
CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA) , N.A. vs NEELY A HAWKINS | |||||||||
16CVI01402 | ERIC EVANS | 11/22/2016 | |||||||
JACOB LEAVITT vs ERIC EVANS | |||||||||
16CVI01449 | KATALYN LAPOINTE | 11/22/2016 | |||||||
MISSI BARRACLOUGH vs KATALYN LAPOINTE | |||||||||
16CVI01445 | DON JAMES | 11/22/2016 | |||||||
RICK JOHN vs DON JAMES | |||||||||
16CVI01440 | BRIAN BOGGS | 11/22/2016 | |||||||
LIN BART INVESTMENTS LLC vs BRIAN BOGGS | |||||||||
11CVH01180 | RACHAEL V LEWIS | 11/22/2016 | |||||||
DISCOVER BANK C/O LEVY & ASSOCIATES vs RACHAEL V LEWIS | |||||||||
07CVH01106 | VALERIE D. CHISOLM | 11/22/2016 | |||||||
ELITE RECOVERY SERVICES vs VALERIE D. CHISOLM | |||||||||
16CVF01531 | MICHAEL J FAIRCHILD | 11/22/2016 | |||||||
CBCS vs MICHAEL J FAIRCHILD | |||||||||
16CVF01420 | GARY T. KNAPP | 11/22/2016 | |||||||
CBCS vs GARY T. KNAPP | |||||||||
14CVF01820 | KAREN WEBB | 11/22/2016 | |||||||
SPRINGLEAF FINANCIAL SERVICES OF OHIO, INC. vs KAREN WEBB | |||||||||
16CVG00167 | SCOTT SHANER, ET AL. | 11/15/2016 | |||||||
JAMES LAVOY vs SCOTT SHANER, ET AL. | |||||||||
16CVG00401 | NICHOLAS LAKES, ET AL. | 11/15/2016 | |||||||
O.L. GARRISON vs NICHOLAS LAKES, ET AL. | |||||||||
15CVE00933 | DELECCA L. STEPHENS | 11/14/2016 | |||||||
ERIE INSURANCE COMPANY vs DELECCA L. STEPHENS | |||||||||
15CVE01130 | PHILIPPE J ROUGIER | 11/14/2016 | |||||||
PROGRESSIVE DIRECT INSURANCE COM vs PHILIPPE J ROUGIER | |||||||||
16CVF00319 | JOSEPH HOWARD | 11/14/2016 | |||||||
STATE OF OHIO, DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION vs JOSEPH HOWARD | |||||||||
Previous 1, 2, 3 ... 385, 386, 387 ... 461, 462, 463 Next |