11344 Cases | Miamisburg Municipal Judgements
Case Number | Defendant | Date | |||||||
19CVF00561 | BYRON WHATLEY, JR. | 7/2/2019 | |||||||
PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOC., LLC vs BYRON WHATLEY, JR. | |||||||||
19CVF00604 | HEATH BOWLING | 7/2/2019 | |||||||
CRESCENT BANK AND TRUST vs HEATH BOWLING | |||||||||
19CVF00622 | KIMBERLY A. PRUITT | 7/1/2019 | |||||||
CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA) N.A. C/O LYONS, DOUGHTY & VELHUIS PC vs KIMBERLY A. PRUIT... | |||||||||
19CVF00846 | DAVID L. WASHINGTON | 7/1/2019 | |||||||
VELOCITY INVESTMENTS, LLC. ASSIGNEE OF ONEMAIN FINANCIAL 20 vs DAVID L. WASHINGTON | |||||||||
19CVI00753 | TIFFANY PONDER | 6/27/2019 | |||||||
PAUL CONOVER vs TIFFANY PONDER | |||||||||
19CVI00790 | SOUTHTOWN C/O MRS. BROWN | 6/27/2019 | |||||||
WILLIAM A. RYAN vs SOUTHTOWN C/O MRS. BROWN | |||||||||
19CVF00293 | WILLIAM A. LOCHARY | 6/26/2019 | |||||||
DAY AIR CREDIT UNION, INC. vs WILLIAM A. LOCHARY | |||||||||
18CVG01761 | MASHEYLA FLEMISTER, AND ALL OTHERS | 6/26/2019 | |||||||
CONSOLIDATED IV, LLC DBA THE KNOLLS APARTMENTS vs MASHEYLA FLEMISTER, AND ALL OTHERS | |||||||||
19CVG01016 | KODY OWENS | 6/26/2019 | |||||||
SUN SECURED FINANCING, LLC DBA OAKWOOD VILLAGE vs KODY OWENS | |||||||||
18CVF01606 | NICHOLAS L. RANSON | 6/25/2019 | |||||||
PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC. vs NICHOLAS L. RANSON | |||||||||
18CVF01658 | INDIA C. CLACK | 6/25/2019 | |||||||
TD BANK USA, N.A. C/O TARGET CORP SERVICES INC. vs INDIA C. CLACK | |||||||||
18CVF01718 | AARON POOLER | 6/25/2019 | |||||||
MIDLAND FUNDING LLC DBI OHIO MIDLAND FUNDING DE LLC vs AARON POOLER | |||||||||
18CVF01743 | MICHAEL WOOTON AKA MICHAEL F. WOOTON | 6/25/2019 | |||||||
PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOC., LLC vs MICHAEL WOOTON AKA MICHAEL F. WOOTON | |||||||||
18CVF01792 | DEAN CRAMER AKA DEAN U. CRAMER | 6/25/2019 | |||||||
PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, L vs DEAN CRAMER AKA DEAN U. CRAMER | |||||||||
Previous 1, 2, 3 ... 384, 385, 386 ... 566, 567, 568 Next |