9258 Cases | Miamisburg Municipal Judgements
Case Number | Defendant | Date | |||||||
17CVF01474 | HEIDI MCGOHAN L AKA HEIDI LYNN MCGOHAN | 11/2/2017 | |||||||
PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC vs HEIDI MCGOHAN L AKA HEIDI LYNN MCGOHAN | |||||||||
17CVF01443 | CHAD D. WEHRLEY | 11/2/2017 | |||||||
CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A. C/O LYONS, DOUGHTY & VELDHUIS P. vs CHAD D. WEHRLEY | |||||||||
17CVI01176 | STEVEN C. HOWARD | 10/31/2017 | |||||||
MICHAEL J. LUCAS vs STEVEN C. HOWARD | |||||||||
17CVI01220 | MATTIE BELLE REESE | 10/31/2017 | |||||||
JONATHAN TAYLOR vs MATTIE BELLE REESE | |||||||||
17CVF01021 | DEMETRIUS WRIGHT | 10/30/2017 | |||||||
EAGLE LOAN COMPANY OF OHIO, INC. vs DEMETRIUS WRIGHT | |||||||||
17CVF01120 | WILLIAM E. SANNES | 10/30/2017 | |||||||
ALLY BANK C/O LEVY & ASSOCIATES, LLC. vs WILLIAM E. SANNES | |||||||||
17CVF01140 | CASSIE CANTER | 10/30/2017 | |||||||
MIDLAND FUNDING LLC DBI OHIO MIDLAND FUNDING DE LLC vs CASSIE CANTER | |||||||||
17CVF01232 | SARAH GREGGERSON AKA SARAH T. GREGGERSON | 10/30/2017 | |||||||
AMERICAN EXPRESS BANK, FSB C/O ZWICKER & ASSOCIATES, P.C. vs SARAH GREGGERSON AKA... | |||||||||
17CVF00816 | GLORIA D. WOODLEY | 10/25/2017 | |||||||
PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC vs GLORIA D. WOODLEY | |||||||||
17CVI01145 | PITA GRILL SALAM ISMAIL/OWNER | 10/25/2017 | |||||||
R. WEIR, INC. vs PITA GRILL SALAM ISMAIL/OWNER | |||||||||
17CVF01434 | DARECK M RUSSO | 10/25/2017 | |||||||
EAGLE LOAN COMPANY OF OHIO, INC. vs DARECK M RUSSO | |||||||||
17CVF00997 | SHELBI L. SMIDDY | 10/25/2017 | |||||||
WORLD'S FOREMOST BANK C/O LEVY & ASSOCIATES, LLC. vs SHELBI L. SMIDDY | |||||||||
17CVF00839 | NICHOLAS NICKELL | 10/25/2017 | |||||||
PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC vs NICHOLAS NICKELL | |||||||||
17CVF00815 | JEANIE HANSHELL | 10/25/2017 | |||||||
PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC vs JEANIE HANSHELL | |||||||||
17CVF00023 | KRYSTAL N. RUPERT | 10/25/2017 | |||||||
TD BANK USA, NA AS SUCCESSOR TO TARGET NATL BANK vs KRYSTAL N. RUPERT | |||||||||
17CVG00256 | KHADEEM HARRISON, ET. AL | 10/24/2017 | |||||||
JAMES CALDWELL vs KHADEEM HARRISON, ET. AL | |||||||||
17CVG01352 | THOMAS SANDERS, ET. AL | 10/24/2017 | |||||||
JON THOMAS vs THOMAS SANDERS, ET. AL | |||||||||
17CVI01211 | TIA VARNEY | 10/24/2017 | |||||||
CHONDA SWANTON vs TIA VARNEY | |||||||||
16CVE00946 | JERRY D BROWN | 10/20/2017 | |||||||
SUN HOMES INC. vs JERRY D BROWN | |||||||||
Previous 1, 2, 3 ... 352, 353, 354 ... 461, 462, 463 Next |