9226 Cases | Miamisburg Municipal Judgements
Case Number | Defendant | Date | |||||||
17CVF01402 | MELANIE K. VELTE | 11/29/2017 | |||||||
CBCS vs MELANIE K. VELTE | |||||||||
17CVF01430 | MARYBETH ROAR | 11/29/2017 | |||||||
MIDLAND FUNDING LLC DBI OHIO AS MIDLAND FUNDING DE LLC vs MARYBETH ROAR | |||||||||
17CVF01335 | BRIAN A. JOHNSON | 11/29/2017 | |||||||
MIDUSA CREDIT UNION INC. vs BRIAN A. JOHNSON | |||||||||
16CVE01715 | CHRISTOPHER LANGENKAMP | 11/28/2017 | |||||||
ALLSTATE FIRE & CASUALTY INSURANCE CO. vs CHRISTOPHER LANGENKAMP | |||||||||
17CVF01025 | LAURA SHELTON | 11/28/2017 | |||||||
CREDIT ACCEPTANCE CORPORATION vs LAURA SHELTON | |||||||||
17CVF01062 | LAURA BURKE | 11/28/2017 | |||||||
CAVALRY SPV I LLC vs LAURA BURKE | |||||||||
17CVF01084 | JONATHAN L. ALLEN | 11/28/2017 | |||||||
TIDEWATER CREDIT SERVICES, LLC. vs JONATHAN L. ALLEN | |||||||||
17CVG01617 | SYLVIA AMBROSE, AND ALL OTHERS | 11/28/2017 | |||||||
GAWAIN CIRCLE, LP DBA CAMBRIDGE COMMONS APTS. vs SYLVIA AMBROSE, AND ALL OTHERS | |||||||||
06CVH01738 | BRENDA S MCMILLIAN | 11/28/2017 | |||||||
ARROW FINANCIAL SERVICES vs BRENDA S MCMILLIAN | |||||||||
17CVI01452 | KINGS FURNITURE & MATTRESS | 11/28/2017 | |||||||
MICHAEL BLANKS vs KINGS FURNITURE & MATTRESS | |||||||||
17CVF01280 | DALLAS ADKINS | 11/27/2017 | |||||||
WALNUT CREEK NURSING CENTER vs DALLAS ADKINS | |||||||||
17CVI01518 | LEAH M. MARTIN | 11/27/2017 | |||||||
MANNING LAW FIRM, LLC vs LEAH M. MARTIN | |||||||||
16CVF01283 | KAILA RENAE BRADY | 11/20/2017 | |||||||
AMICA MUTUAL INSURANCE CO. AS SUBROGEE OF TUSHAR SHAH vs KAILA RENAE BRADY | |||||||||
17CVF01389 | JANELLE BOSTELMAN | 11/20/2017 | |||||||
SYNCHRONY BANK C/O ZWICKER & ASSOCIATES, P.C. vs JANELLE BOSTELMAN | |||||||||
17CVF01523 | TOMMY VO | 11/20/2017 | |||||||
MIDLAND FUNDING LLC DBI OHIO AS MIDLAND FUNDING DE LLC vs TOMMY VO | |||||||||
17CVF01753 | ISAAC M OSHEA | 11/20/2017 | |||||||
CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A. C/O LYONS, DOUGHTY & VELHUIS P.C vs ISAAC M OSHEA | |||||||||
17CVG01141 | DENNIS MCHUE, ET. AL | 11/14/2017 | |||||||
CONSOLIDATED IV, LLC. DBA THE KNOLLS APARTMENTS vs DENNIS McHUE, ET. AL | |||||||||
17CVI01337 | JAMES COOK | 11/14/2017 | |||||||
CRAIG TICKEL vs JAMES COOK | |||||||||
17CVI01338 | DEREK STRUTTON | 11/14/2017 | |||||||
JOHN R. BURNS vs DEREK STRUTTON | |||||||||
Previous 1, 2, 3 ... 348, 349, 350 ... 460, 461, 462 Next |