9246 Cases | Miamisburg Municipal Judgements
Case Number | Defendant | Date | |||||||
17CVF01594 | STACY WARD | 1/8/2018 | |||||||
MIDLAND FUNDING LLC DBA MIDLAND FUNDING DE LLC vs STACY WARD | |||||||||
17CVF01714 | SHEILA A MCGUIRE | 1/8/2018 | |||||||
BRINKLEY PROPERTIES, LTD. vs SHEILA A MCGUIRE | |||||||||
17CVG01917 | KYLA CARTWRIGHT, ET AL. | 1/8/2018 | |||||||
SUN SECURED FINANCING, LLC. DBA OAKWOOD VILLAGE vs KYLA CARTWRIGHT, ET AL. | |||||||||
17CVF01593 | JIMMY WORDEN | 1/8/2018 | |||||||
MIDLAND FUNDING LLC DBA MIDLAND FUNDING DE LLC vs JIMMY WORDEN | |||||||||
17CVF01625 | ANGELA MYERS | 1/4/2018 | |||||||
MARINER FINANCE, LLC vs ANGELA MYERS | |||||||||
05CVH00475 | CHARLES E MISER | 1/4/2018 | |||||||
DISCOVER BANK vs CHARLES E MISER | |||||||||
17CVF01674 | MARCIA STIDHAM | 1/4/2018 | |||||||
MARINER FINANCE, LLC vs MARCIA STIDHAM | |||||||||
17CVF01395 | SCOTT BOAK | 1/4/2018 | |||||||
CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA) , N.A. vs SCOTT BOAK | |||||||||
17CVF01332 | RICHARD C. BARRETT JR | 1/4/2018 | |||||||
MIDUSA CREDIT UNION INC. vs RICHARD C. BARRETT JR | |||||||||
17CVF01330 | ANN EWING | 1/4/2018 | |||||||
ONEMAIN FINANCIAL OF OHIO INC. vs ANN EWING | |||||||||
17CVF01307 | PHILLIP PLANCK | 1/4/2018 | |||||||
UNIVERSAL 1 CREDIT UNION INC. vs PHILLIP PLANCK | |||||||||
17CVF01024 | KATELYN M. WHITT | 1/4/2018 | |||||||
DAY AIR CREDIT UNION, INC. vs KATELYN M. WHITT | |||||||||
17CVF00760 | HEATHER TAYLOR | 1/4/2018 | |||||||
COMENITY BANK vs HEATHER TAYLOR | |||||||||
17CVG01650 | NEIL TONKLI, ET AL. | 1/2/2018 | |||||||
KEN MORRIS vs NEIL TONKLI, ET AL. | |||||||||
16CVF01584 | RUTH DEVAN | 12/22/2017 | |||||||
PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC vs RUTH DEVAN | |||||||||
16CVF01791 | ANGELA M CURRY | 12/22/2017 | |||||||
PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC vs ANGELA M CURRY | |||||||||
17CVG00993 | DEBORAH L. DOOLIN, ET. AL | 12/20/2017 | |||||||
MICHAEL GROSS vs DEBORAH L. DOOLIN, ET. AL | |||||||||
17CVI01751 | SAMANTHA DEAN | 12/20/2017 | |||||||
DOUBLETREE SUITES BY HILTON SPENCER STRICKLER - MANAGER vs SAMANTHA DEAN | |||||||||
17CVE01200 | MICHAEL SCHENCK | 12/19/2017 | |||||||
SUN HOMES INC. C/O SLOVIN & ASSOCIATES CO. LPA vs MICHAEL SCHENCK | |||||||||
Previous 1, 2, 3 ... 346, 347, 348 ... 461, 462, 463 Next |