9246 Cases | Miamisburg Municipal Judgements
Case Number | Defendant | Date | |||||||
17CVF01792 | JONATHON D ELKING | 3/16/2018 | |||||||
DISCOVER BANK C/O DISCOVER PRODUCTS, INC. vs JONATHON D ELKING | |||||||||
17CVF01282 | FRANCHESKA GALVAN | 3/13/2018 | |||||||
CAPITAL ALLIANCE FINANCIAL, LLC vs FRANCHESKA GALVAN | |||||||||
17CVF01922 | MATTEW WILLIAMS | 3/13/2018 | |||||||
CREDIT CORP SOLUTIONS INC vs MATTEW WILLIAMS | |||||||||
17CVF01885 | ROBBIE IGO | 3/13/2018 | |||||||
LVNV FUNDING LLC vs ROBBIE IGO | |||||||||
17CVF01883 | RANSOME ROWLAND | 3/13/2018 | |||||||
LVNV FUNDING LLC vs RANSOME ROWLAND | |||||||||
17CVF01880 | STEVEN MYNES | 3/13/2018 | |||||||
LVNV FUNDING LLC vs STEVEN MYNES | |||||||||
17CVF01867 | ROSEMARY DUTTON | 3/13/2018 | |||||||
LVNV FUNDING LLC vs ROSEMARY DUTTON | |||||||||
17CVF01829 | STEVE MYNES | 3/13/2018 | |||||||
MIDLAND FUNDING LLC DBI OHIO MIDLAND FUNDING DE LLC vs STEVE MYNES | |||||||||
17CVF01720 | DANIEL LAMB | 3/13/2018 | |||||||
MIDLAND FUNDING LLC DBI OHIO MIDLAND FUNDING DE LLC vs DANIEL LAMB | |||||||||
17CVF01624 | KAREN S. SANGER | 3/13/2018 | |||||||
MARINER FINANCE, LLC. vs KAREN S. SANGER | |||||||||
17CVF01457 | MICHAEL TACKETT | 3/13/2018 | |||||||
CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A. C/O LYONS, DOUGHTY & VELDHUIS vs MICHAEL TACKETT | |||||||||
17CVF01416 | TERRI BREWER, ET AL. | 3/13/2018 | |||||||
MARINER FINANCE, LLC vs TERRI BREWER, ET AL. | |||||||||
17CVF01315 | MICHAEL TACKETT | 3/13/2018 | |||||||
MIDLAND FUNDING LLC DBI OHIO AS MIDLAND FUNDING DE LLC vs MICHAEL TACKETT | |||||||||
18CVF00274 | APRIL FLINT | 3/12/2018 | |||||||
CBCS vs APRIL FLINT | |||||||||
18CVI00079 | LINDSAY BRANSCOMB EMLEY | 3/8/2018 | |||||||
CHRISTINA NEWBORN vs LINDSAY BRANSCOMB EMLEY | |||||||||
17CVF01392 | DAVID STEPHENS | 3/6/2018 | |||||||
CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A. vs DAVID STEPHENS | |||||||||
17CVF01394 | NICHOLAS A. NOCK | 3/6/2018 | |||||||
CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA) N.A. vs NICHOLAS A. NOCK | |||||||||
17CVF01505 | KRYSTAL A WATT | 3/6/2018 | |||||||
UNIFUND CCR PARTNERS vs KRYSTAL A WATT | |||||||||
17CVF01651 | VICKIE D HANNAH | 3/6/2018 | |||||||
CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A. C/O LYONS, DOUGHTY & VELDHUIS vs VICKIE D HANNAH | |||||||||
Previous 1, 2, 3 ... 336, 337, 338 ... 461, 462, 463 Next |