9246 Cases | Miamisburg Municipal Judgements
Case Number | Defendant | Date | |||||||
19CVF01032 | FAYTH HUBBARD | 9/24/2019 | |||||||
CBCS vs FAYTH HUBBARD | |||||||||
19CVF01356 | ALICIA ALEEN | 9/24/2019 | |||||||
CREDIT CORP SOLUTIONS, INC. vs ALICIA ALEEN | |||||||||
19CVF01334 | KIMBERLEE THARP | 9/24/2019 | |||||||
PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOC., LLC vs KIMBERLEE THARP | |||||||||
19CVF01186 | MARY H. SIENS | 9/24/2019 | |||||||
CITIBANK, N.A. vs MARY H. SIENS | |||||||||
19CVF01134 | ASHLEY HIRN | 9/24/2019 | |||||||
CITIBANK, N.A. vs ASHLEY HIRN | |||||||||
19CVF01128 | JANINE L. HUNTER | 9/24/2019 | |||||||
DEPARTMENT STORES NATIONAL BANK vs JANINE L. HUNTER | |||||||||
19CVF01120 | BRANDY WIELGUS | 9/24/2019 | |||||||
OHIO DENTAL PROFESSIONALS, DELIS DBA FAIRFIELD FAMILY DENTAL vs BRANDY WIELGUS | |||||||||
19CVF01109 | SARAH RICH | 9/24/2019 | |||||||
MIDLAND FUNDING LLC DBI OHIO AS MIDLAND FUNDING DE, vs SARAH RICH | |||||||||
19CVF01093 | BETTY CLARK | 9/24/2019 | |||||||
CREDIT CORP SOLUTIONS INC. vs BETTY CLARK | |||||||||
19CVF01035 | JERRY F. DEAN | 9/24/2019 | |||||||
CBCS vs JERRY F. DEAN | |||||||||
19CVF01034 | SCOTT A. GOERNDT | 9/24/2019 | |||||||
CBCS vs SCOTT A. GOERNDT | |||||||||
19CVF00987 | TAMARA A. EGAN | 9/24/2019 | |||||||
CBCS vs TAMARA A. EGAN | |||||||||
17CVG01141 | DENNIS MCHUE, ET. AL | 9/23/2019 | |||||||
CONSOLIDATED IV, LLC. DBA THE KNOLLS APARTMENTS vs DENNIS McHUE, ET. AL | |||||||||
19CVF00482 | BREANDRE WATTS | 9/17/2019 | |||||||
MSW CAPITAL LLC vs BREANDRE WATTS | |||||||||
19CVG01277 | JASON CLARK, AND ALL OTHERS | 9/17/2019 | |||||||
SUN COMMUNITIES OPERATING LTD PARTNERSHIP vs JASON CLARK, AND ALL OTHERS | |||||||||
19CVG01279 | AMY LUCAS, AND ALL OTHERS | 9/17/2019 | |||||||
SUN COMMUNITIES OPERATING LTD PARTNERSHIP vs AMY LUCAS, AND ALL OTHERS | |||||||||
19CVF00711 | VAN L. DINH | 9/13/2019 | |||||||
BARCLAYS BANK DELAWARE vs VAN L. DINH | |||||||||
19CVF01138 | DEBRA J. DUFF | 9/13/2019 | |||||||
PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOC., LLC vs DEBRA J. DUFF | |||||||||
19CVF00767 | JOSHUA W. FILBERT | 9/12/2019 | |||||||
CITIBANK, N.A. vs JOSHUA W. FILBERT | |||||||||
Previous 1, 2, 3 ... 262, 263, 264 ... 461, 462, 463 Next |