9164 Cases | Miamisburg Municipal Judgements
Case Number | Defendant | Date | |||||||
19CVF01022 | MELISSA A. CAMBIZACA | 8/27/2019 | |||||||
ONEMAIN FINANCIAL GROUP, LLC vs MELISSA A. CAMBIZACA | |||||||||
19CVF01114 | AMBER GOTTHARDT | 8/26/2019 | |||||||
CBCS vs AMBER GOTTHARDT | |||||||||
19CVF01226 | JAY N. CALIGIURI | 8/26/2019 | |||||||
CAVALRY SPV I, LLC vs JAY N. CALIGIURI | |||||||||
19CVG01305 | ROBERT GARLAND | 8/22/2019 | |||||||
NICHOLAS ANGELO vs ROBERT GARLAND | |||||||||
19CVF00689 | BRANDI BLOOM | 8/20/2019 | |||||||
CONSOLIDATED IV, LLC. DBA THE KNOLLS APARTMENTS vs BRANDI BLOOM | |||||||||
11CVH00586 | HOWARD HAVENS | 8/20/2019 | |||||||
MIDLAND FUNDING LLC DBA IN OHIO MIDLAND FUNDING DE vs HOWARD HAVENS | |||||||||
19CVF01151 | HEATHER M. HUDSON | 8/20/2019 | |||||||
CBCS vs HEATHER M. HUDSON | |||||||||
19CVF01139 | LACEY ABPLANALP | 8/20/2019 | |||||||
PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOC., LLC vs LACEY ABPLANALP | |||||||||
19CVF01004 | DANIELLE FILBERT | 8/20/2019 | |||||||
SYNCHRONY BANK C/O ZWICKER & ASSOCIATES, P.C. vs DANIELLE FILBERT | |||||||||
19CVF00996 | ROBBIE S. HATTON | 8/20/2019 | |||||||
CAVALRY SPV I, LLC C/O LEVY & ASSOCIATES, LLC vs ROBBIE S. HATTON | |||||||||
19CVF00891 | NAPHTALINE BOLINJI | 8/20/2019 | |||||||
MIDLAND FUNDING LLC DBI OHIO MIDLAND FUNDING DE LLC vs NAPHTALINE BOLINJI | |||||||||
19CVF00766 | GLORIA J. GEPHART | 8/20/2019 | |||||||
CITIBANK, N.A. vs GLORIA J. GEPHART | |||||||||
19CVF00547 | JENNIFER BARNES | 8/20/2019 | |||||||
SULLIVAN UNIVERSITY C/O RACHEL J. MASON vs JENNIFER BARNES | |||||||||
19CVF00334 | LINDSEY MAXWELL | 8/20/2019 | |||||||
MIDLAND FUNDING LLC DB IN OHIO AS MIDLAND FUNDING DE vs LINDSEY MAXWELL | |||||||||
19CVF00255 | JACOB N. PAYNE | 8/20/2019 | |||||||
CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA) N.A. C/O LYONS, DOUGHTY & VELHUIS PC vs JACOB N. PAYNE | |||||||||
19CVF00068 | LOUIS J DUDRICK | 8/20/2019 | |||||||
MIDLAND FUNDING LLC DBI IN OHIO AS MIDLAND FUNDING D vs LOUIS J DUDRICK | |||||||||
19CVF00058 | LISA G. PARTEE | 8/20/2019 | |||||||
CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA) N.A. C/O LYONS, DOUGHTY & VELHUIS PC vs LISA G. PARTEE | |||||||||
18CVF01697 | WALTERS MBANYASIG AKA WALTERS N. MBANYASIG | 8/20/2019 | |||||||
CREDIT ACCEPTANCE CORPORATION vs WALTERS MBANYASIG AKA WALTERS N. MBANYASIG | |||||||||
18CVF02107 | ANDREW M WILSON | 8/15/2019 | |||||||
PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC vs ANDREW M WILSON | |||||||||
Previous 1, 2, 3 ... 261, 262, 263 ... 457, 458, 459 Next |