9246 Cases | Miamisburg Municipal Judgements
Case Number | Defendant | Date | |||||||
19CVF02211 | ROY EUGENE DENNEY | 1/2/2020 | |||||||
BANK OF AMERICA N.A. vs ROY EUGENE DENNEY | |||||||||
18CVG01886 | CLARA WENDLING, AND ALL OTHERS | 1/2/2020 | |||||||
O.L. GARRISON vs CLARA WENDLING, AND ALL OTHERS | |||||||||
19CVG00513 | JACKIE BERRY, AND ALL OTHERS | 1/2/2020 | |||||||
O.L. GARRISON vs JACKIE BERRY, AND ALL OTHERS | |||||||||
19CVG01656 | TIFFANY GRIGGS KORN, ET AL | 1/2/2020 | |||||||
O.L. GARRISON JR vs TIFFANY GRIGGS KORN, ET AL | |||||||||
19CVI01812 | YANCY MURCIA | 1/2/2020 | |||||||
MELISSA CAMBIZACA vs YANCY MURCIA | |||||||||
19CVI01935 | ALLEN JEFFERY AKA ALLENS PAVING | 1/2/2020 | |||||||
RYAN COMBS vs ALLEN JEFFERY AKA ALLENS PAVING | |||||||||
19CVI02022 | ANA GALLEGOS | 1/2/2020 | |||||||
LAURA K. VALANGEON vs ANA GALLEGOS | |||||||||
19CVF02016 | JENNIFER L. LAWSON | 1/2/2020 | |||||||
CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA) N.A. C/O LYONS, DOUGHTY & VELHUIS PC vs JENNIFER L. LAWSO... | |||||||||
19CVF01977 | MEGAN E. PRICE | 12/27/2019 | |||||||
PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOC., LLC vs MEGAN E. PRICE | |||||||||
19CVF01800 | PAUL D. BERNARD | 12/27/2019 | |||||||
PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOC., LLC vs PAUL D. BERNARD | |||||||||
19CVF01792 | PAUL KWIATKOWSKI | 12/27/2019 | |||||||
CBCS vs PAUL KWIATKOWSKI | |||||||||
19CVF01500 | KIMBERLY A. PRUITT | 12/26/2019 | |||||||
SYNCHRONY BANK C/O ZWICKER & ASSOCIATES, P.C. vs KIMBERLY A. PRUITT | |||||||||
19CVF01633 | ROXANA COREAS | 12/26/2019 | |||||||
CONSOLIDATED IV, LLC DBA THE KNOLLS APARTMENTS vs ROXANA COREAS | |||||||||
19CVF01669 | COREY R. HELLER | 12/26/2019 | |||||||
DISCOVER BANK C/O DISCOVER PRODUCTS, INC. vs COREY R. HELLER | |||||||||
19CVI01765 | ROCKY WHICKER | 12/12/2019 | |||||||
SARAH MAJEED vs ROCKY WHICKER | |||||||||
19CVI01813 | BRIAN BRANNON | 12/12/2019 | |||||||
GREG COLLINS vs BRIAN BRANNON | |||||||||
19CVF00221 | FELICIA HEARD AKA FELICIA S. HEARD | 12/10/2019 | |||||||
PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOC., LLC vs FELICIA HEARD AKA FELICIA S. HEARD | |||||||||
19CVF00306 | ERIN SHAW | 12/10/2019 | |||||||
PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC. vs ERIN SHAW | |||||||||
19CVF00316 | SAMUEL LYNINGER | 12/10/2019 | |||||||
CREDIT ACCEPTANCE CORP vs SAMUEL LYNINGER | |||||||||
Previous 1, 2, 3 ... 250, 251, 252 ... 461, 462, 463 Next |