Daily Law Journal
4548 Cases | Miamisburg Municipal Judgements
Case Number Defendant Date
13CVI01838 LORI JOHNSON 1/8/2014
GARY HARDY DBA BRUNNERS LAWN AND SERVICES, vs LORI JOHNSON
03CVH01165 PEGGY R ADKINS 1/8/2014
CREDIT INVESTMENT INC vs PEGGY R ADKINS
13CVI01855 ED CHICKETTI 1/8/2014
INTERSTATE FORD INC. BY DENNIS DEVER, DIRECTOR vs ED CHICKETTI
13CVF01699 ROBERT N HALLER 1/6/2014
LVNV FUNDING LLC C/O RESURGENT CAPITAL SERVICES L vs ROBERT N HALLER
13CVF01145 BOB VASCAVAGE 1/6/2014
MIDLAND FUNDING LLC DBA IN OHIO MIDLAND FUNDING DE vs BOB VASCAVAGE
13CVF01706 ADAM MOFFITT 1/6/2014
STERLING JEWELERS INC. DBA OSTERMAN JEWELERS vs ADAM MOFFITT
13CVF01644 ALTON J PETER 1/2/2014
CBCS vs ALTON J PETER
13CVG01553 STEVE HAMMOCK, ET AL. 12/30/2013
ROBERT BRANE vs STEVE HAMMOCK, ET AL.
13CVF01636 OSCAR E SAULE 12/27/2013
STELLAR RECOVERY, INC C/O LEVY & ASSOCIATES, LLC vs OSCAR E SAULE
13CVF01401 MICHAEL A PRICE 12/27/2013
CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), NA vs MICHAEL A PRICE
13CVF01712 RAYLENE M ABNER 12/23/2013
SOUTHVIEW PATHOLOGISTS IN vs RAYLENE M ABNER
13CVF01614 KELLIE L. HELTON 12/23/2013
CAPITAL AUTO CREDIT, LLC vs KELLIE L. HELTON
05CVF00224 TERI L BLANKENSHIP 12/18/2013
MERCHANTS ACCEPTANCE INC vs TERI L BLANKENSHIP
13CVI01661 NAKESHA HAYWOOD 12/18/2013
COMPETITIVE EDGE ATHLETICS vs NAKESHA HAYWOOD
13CVI01741 GREGORY MAXEY 12/18/2013
ANDREW BODKIN vs GREGORY MAXEY
13CVH01921 MIKE RANKIN, REG 12/18/2013
DAVID C PRICE vs MIKE RANKIN, REG
13CVI01663 CRYSTAL SHELL 12/18/2013
COMPETITIVE EDGE ATHLETICS vs CRYSTAL SHELL
13CVF01370 MICHAEL VOGEL 12/17/2013
WRIGHT PATT CREDIT UNION vs MICHAEL VOGEL
13CVF01595 DOUGLAS P KOTNIK 12/17/2013
CARROLLTON POINTE APARTMENTS vs DOUGLAS P KOTNIK

Previous  1, 2, 3 ... 220, 221, 222 ... 226, 227, 228  Next