9258 Cases | Miamisburg Municipal Judgements
Case Number | Defendant | Date | |||||||
CVH2100918 | 4/8/2021 | ||||||||
BOLES, SHERRI vs | |||||||||
20CVF01310 | ANTHONY PALMER | 4/7/2021 | |||||||
THE CONNOR GROUP vs ANTHONY PALMER | |||||||||
21CVI00078 | APPLIANCE FACTORY MATTRESS KINGDOM | 4/7/2021 | |||||||
DENNIS TROUSDALE vs APPLIANCE FACTORY MATTRESS KINGDOM | |||||||||
20CVF01172 | MAI N. VO | 4/6/2021 | |||||||
CITIBANK, N.A. vs MAI N. VO | |||||||||
20CVF01585 | LYLE DALTON | 4/6/2021 | |||||||
BRIDGECREST ACCEPTANCE CORP. c/o SLOVIN & ASSOC. Co. LPA vs LYLE DALTON | |||||||||
20CVF01475 | DEBORAH K. HILL | 4/6/2021 | |||||||
LVNV FUNDING LLC vs DEBORAH K. HILL | |||||||||
20CVF01422 | THELMA J. BRYANT | 4/6/2021 | |||||||
BANK OF AMERICA, N.A. C/O LEVY & ASSOCIATES, LLC vs THELMA J. BRYANT | |||||||||
20CVF01397 | CINDY L. HIPSHER | 4/6/2021 | |||||||
DAY AIR CREDIT UNION, INC. vs CINDY L. HIPSHER | |||||||||
20CVF01380 | CANDY THORPE | 4/6/2021 | |||||||
CANDLESTONE RECOVERY LLC c/o MARKOFF LAW LLC vs CANDY THORPE | |||||||||
20CVF01236 | DENNIS SCHITZINGER | 4/6/2021 | |||||||
PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOC., LLC vs DENNIS SCHITZINGER | |||||||||
20CVF01062 | CHRISTOPHER BLATZ | 4/6/2021 | |||||||
CITIBANK, N.A. vs CHRISTOPHER BLATZ | |||||||||
20CVF00815 | CHRISTINA MCCONNELL | 4/6/2021 | |||||||
CBCS vs CHRISTINA MCCONNELL | |||||||||
20CVF00441 | BRENDA KATHLEEN WAX | 4/6/2021 | |||||||
MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT, INC. vs BRENDA KATHLEEN WAX | |||||||||
20CVE01395 | MATTHEW H. REIS | 4/6/2021 | |||||||
PROGRESSIVE DIRECT INSURANCE COMPANY vs MATTHEW H. REIS | |||||||||
20CVE00870 | SAMUEL ALLEN CAMPBELL | 4/6/2021 | |||||||
PROGRESSIVE DIRECT INS. CO. vs SAMUEL ALLEN CAMPBELL | |||||||||
20CVE00388 | COURTNEY NICOLE STRICKLAND | 4/6/2021 | |||||||
PEKIN INSURANCE COMPANY vs COURTNEY NICOLE STRICKLAND | |||||||||
20CVF00145 | BOMBASH EXTERIORS, LLC C/O STAT AGNT, MICHAEL F. S... | 4/1/2021 | |||||||
THERMAL TECH INSULATION INC. vs BOMBASH EXTERIORS, LLC C/O STAT AGNT, MICHAEL F. S... | |||||||||
20CVF01313 | MICHAEL GEBART AKA MICHAEL L GEBHART | 3/31/2021 | |||||||
AMERICAN EXPRESS NAT'L BANK c/o ZWICKER & ASSOC. vs MICHAEL GEBART AKA MICH... | |||||||||
Previous 1, 2, 3 ... 209, 210, 211 ... 461, 462, 463 Next |