9226 Cases | Miamisburg Municipal Judgements
Case Number | Defendant | Date | |||||||
20CVF01397 | CINDY L. HIPSHER | 4/6/2021 | |||||||
DAY AIR CREDIT UNION, INC. vs CINDY L. HIPSHER | |||||||||
20CVF01422 | THELMA J. BRYANT | 4/6/2021 | |||||||
BANK OF AMERICA, N.A. C/O LEVY & ASSOCIATES, LLC vs THELMA J. BRYANT | |||||||||
20CVF01475 | DEBORAH K. HILL | 4/6/2021 | |||||||
LVNV FUNDING LLC vs DEBORAH K. HILL | |||||||||
20CVF01585 | LYLE DALTON | 4/6/2021 | |||||||
BRIDGECREST ACCEPTANCE CORP. c/o SLOVIN & ASSOC. Co. LPA vs LYLE DALTON | |||||||||
20CVF01380 | CANDY THORPE | 4/6/2021 | |||||||
CANDLESTONE RECOVERY LLC c/o MARKOFF LAW LLC vs CANDY THORPE | |||||||||
20CVF00145 | BOMBASH EXTERIORS, LLC C/O STAT AGNT, MICHAEL F. S... | 4/1/2021 | |||||||
THERMAL TECH INSULATION INC. vs BOMBASH EXTERIORS, LLC C/O STAT AGNT, MICHAEL F. S... | |||||||||
20CVF01313 | MICHAEL GEBART AKA MICHAEL L GEBHART | 3/31/2021 | |||||||
AMERICAN EXPRESS NAT'L BANK c/o ZWICKER & ASSOC. vs MICHAEL GEBART AKA MICH... | |||||||||
20CVF00917 | AMBER NICOLE BRAGG | 3/30/2021 | |||||||
JEFFERSON CAPITAL SYSSTEMS, LLC vs AMBER NICOLE BRAGG | |||||||||
20CVF01588 | TROY BLOOMER | 3/30/2021 | |||||||
CREDIT CORP SOLUTIONS INC. vs TROY BLOOMER | |||||||||
20CVF01571 | SHARON HESS | 3/30/2021 | |||||||
CAVALRY SPV I, LLC C/O LEVY & ASSOCIATES, LLC vs SHARON HESS | |||||||||
20CVF01191 | KRYSTAL C. HOLDER | 3/30/2021 | |||||||
CAVALRY SPV I, LLC C/O LEVY & ASSOCIATES, LLC vs KRYSTAL C. HOLDER | |||||||||
20CVF00921 | JULIE A. YOUNG | 3/30/2021 | |||||||
JEFFERSON CAPITAL SYSTEMS, LLC vs JULIE A. YOUNG | |||||||||
20CVF00919 | HEIDI RUSSELL | 3/30/2021 | |||||||
JEFFERSON CAPITAL SYSSTEMS, LLC vs HEIDI RUSSELL | |||||||||
20CVF00741 | RONNA TILLEY | 3/30/2021 | |||||||
JEFFERSON CAPITAL SYSTEMS, LLC vs RONNA TILLEY | |||||||||
20CVF00562 | ASHLEY E. NEUBERG | 3/30/2021 | |||||||
UNIFUND CCR, LLC vs ASHLEY E. NEUBERG | |||||||||
20CVF00161 | ROGER POTEET | 3/30/2021 | |||||||
JEFFERSON CAPITAL SYSTEMS, LLC vs ROGER POTEET | |||||||||
20CVF00448 | JACOB SCHAFER | 3/29/2021 | |||||||
DISCOVER BANK C/O DISCOVER PRODUCTS, INC. vs JACOB SCHAFER | |||||||||
20CVF01072 | LONNIE MATHEWS | 3/29/2021 | |||||||
CKS PRIME INVESTMENTS, LLC vs LONNIE MATHEWS | |||||||||
20CVF01488 | SALLY FISTE | 3/12/2021 | |||||||
PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOC., LLC vs SALLY FISTE | |||||||||
Previous 1, 2, 3 ... 208, 209, 210 ... 460, 461, 462 Next |