9164 Cases | Miamisburg Municipal Judgements
Case Number | Defendant | Date | |||||||
20CVF01198 | STACY SHADE | 2/23/2021 | |||||||
BANK OF AMERICA, N.A. C/O LEVY & ASSOCIATES, LLC vs STACY SHADE | |||||||||
20CVF01303 | BRITTANY M. RUSSELL | 2/23/2021 | |||||||
MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT, INC. vs BRITTANY M. RUSSELL | |||||||||
20CVF00991 | JOHN CRETSINGER AKA JOHN CRETSINGER JR | 2/23/2021 | |||||||
LVNV FUNDING LLC vs JOHN CRETSINGER AKA JOHN CRETSINGER JR | |||||||||
20CVF01262 | STEVEN P. TILEY | 2/17/2021 | |||||||
DISCOVER BANK C/O DISCOVER PRODUCTS, INC. vs STEVEN P. TILEY | |||||||||
20CVF01522 | ROBERT HALLER | 2/17/2021 | |||||||
REVCO SOLUTIONS, INC. vs ROBERT HALLER | |||||||||
20CVF01581 | MICHAEL J. FAIRCHILD | 2/17/2021 | |||||||
MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT, INC. vs MICHAEL J. FAIRCHILD | |||||||||
20CVF01202 | TEASHA M. BELL | 2/16/2021 | |||||||
ONEMAIN FINANCIAL GROUP, LLC vs TEASHA M. BELL | |||||||||
20CVF01364 | HARLEY H. ERVIN, JR. | 2/16/2021 | |||||||
CREDITMAX, INC. vs HARLEY H. ERVIN, JR. | |||||||||
20CVF00699 | DEMETRIUS SNODDY | 2/16/2021 | |||||||
LVNV FUNDING LLC vs DEMETRIUS SNODDY | |||||||||
20CVF00287 | SHARON J. LAWRENCE | 2/16/2021 | |||||||
TD BANK USA, SUCCESSOR TO TARGET vs SHARON J. LAWRENCE | |||||||||
20CVF00221 | TORI DILLON YOUNG | 2/16/2021 | |||||||
CROWN WOODHILLS, LLC BY REALTY GROUP LLC vs TORI DILLON YOUNG | |||||||||
CVH2101027 | 2/8/2021 | ||||||||
HUMANE SOCIETY OF GREATER DAYT vs | |||||||||
09CVH00825 | PATRICIA L. CASEY | 2/4/2021 | |||||||
LVNV FUNDING, LLC vs PATRICIA L. CASEY | |||||||||
12CVH00915 | CASEY GRILLOT AKA CASEY M BARRETT | 2/4/2021 | |||||||
MIDLAND FUNDING LLC DBA IN OHIO MIDLAND FUNDING DE vs CASEY GRILLOT AKA CASEY M BAR... | |||||||||
20CVF01137 | AMBER CARTER | 2/3/2021 | |||||||
GEO BYERS SONS HOLDING INC vs AMBER CARTER | |||||||||
20CVE00910 | LORETTA BIZZELL (#W105570) | 2/2/2021 | |||||||
CINCINNATI INSURANCE COMPANY vs LORETTA BIZZELL (#W105570) | |||||||||
19CVF02010 | DIANA E. DAVIS | 2/2/2021 | |||||||
MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT, INC. vs DIANA E. DAVIS | |||||||||
20CVF00133 | JAMI M. PRICE | 2/2/2021 | |||||||
FORSYTHE FINANCE LLC vs JAMI M. PRICE | |||||||||
Previous 1, 2, 3 ... 207, 208, 209 ... 457, 458, 459 Next |