9226 Cases | Miamisburg Municipal Judgements
Case Number | Defendant | Date | |||||||
20CVF01523 | DAISHA T BASINGER | 5/25/2021 | |||||||
REVCO SOLUTIONS, INC. vs DAISHA T BASINGER | |||||||||
21CVF00149 | RICHARD BRIGHAM | 5/25/2021 | |||||||
REVCO SOLUTIONS, INC. vs RICHARD BRIGHAM | |||||||||
21CVF00532 | AMANDA AVERY | 5/24/2021 | |||||||
REVCO SOLUTIONS, INC. vs AMANDA AVERY | |||||||||
20CVF00912 | TROY S. BLOOMER | 5/13/2021 | |||||||
PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOC., LLC vs TROY S. BLOOMER | |||||||||
20CVF00960 | LAURENCE J. HUGHES | 5/13/2021 | |||||||
CBCS vs LAURENCE J. HUGHES | |||||||||
20CVF01023 | TINA WRIGHT | 5/13/2021 | |||||||
PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC vs TINA WRIGHT | |||||||||
21CVF00203 | PRIME CONCRETE CO. SERVE: ROBERT RATKE, AGENT | 5/11/2021 | |||||||
DAYTON SUPERIOR CORPORATION vs PRIME CONCRETE Co. SERVE: ROBERT RATKE, AGENT | |||||||||
21CVF00495 | CLINT DELPH | 5/11/2021 | |||||||
CBCS vs CLINT DELPH | |||||||||
21CVF00056 | ANN EWING | 5/10/2021 | |||||||
VELOCITY INVESTMENTS LLC ASSIGNEE OF LENDINGCLUB CORP vs ANN EWING | |||||||||
20CVF00594 | MARILYN BYRD | 4/29/2021 | |||||||
SECOND ROUND SUB, LLC. vs MARILYN BYRD | |||||||||
20CVF01009 | CATHY PAUGH | 4/29/2021 | |||||||
PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOC., LLC vs CATHY PAUGH | |||||||||
21CVF00294 | KELSEY MENGLE | 4/29/2021 | |||||||
CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA) , N.A. vs KELSEY MENGLE | |||||||||
21CVI00216 | JONATHAN MUSGROVE AKA DECKER GUY | 4/29/2021 | |||||||
KATHY SMITH vs JONATHAN MUSGROVE AKA DECKER GUY | |||||||||
Previous 1, 2, 3 ... 206, 207, 208 ... 460, 461, 462 Next |