9226 Cases | Miamisburg Municipal Judgements
Case Number | Defendant | Date | |||||||
20CVF01516 | RACHEL MORELL | 6/8/2021 | |||||||
FORSYTHE FINANCE LLC vs RACHEL MORELL | |||||||||
21CVF00050 | SHANDOL T. MANN | 6/8/2021 | |||||||
CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A. C/O LYONS, DOUGHTY & VELHUIS P.C vs SHANDOL T. MANN | |||||||||
21CVF00087 | ROBERT MCDOWELL | 6/8/2021 | |||||||
CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA) N.A. vs ROBERT MCDOWELL | |||||||||
20CVF01515 | BRAD FRAME | 6/8/2021 | |||||||
ABSOLUTE RESOLUTIONS INVT., LLC ASSIGNEE OF CITIBANK, N.A. vs BRAD FRAME | |||||||||
21CVF00467 | MARLENE DITTO | 6/7/2021 | |||||||
MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT, INC. vs MARLENE DITTO | |||||||||
21CVF00515 | MARIAN PAINTER | 6/7/2021 | |||||||
TD BANK USA, N.A. vs MARIAN PAINTER | |||||||||
21CVF00282 | BRITTANY WISE AKA BRITTANY L JOHNSON | 6/3/2021 | |||||||
LVNV FUNDING LLC vs BRITTANY WISE AKA BRITTANY L JOHNSON | |||||||||
20CVF01113 | DIANE BLEDSOE | 6/1/2021 | |||||||
LVNV FUNDING, LLC vs DIANE BLEDSOE | |||||||||
21CVF00533 | ASHLEY BLACKBELL | 6/1/2021 | |||||||
REVCO SOLUTIONS, INC. vs ASHLEY BLACKBELL | |||||||||
21CVF00506 | STEPHANIE CHEEWAH | 6/1/2021 | |||||||
AMERICAN EXPRESS NATIONAL BANK vs STEPHANIE CHEEWAH | |||||||||
21CVF00342 | BRITTANY WISE | 6/1/2021 | |||||||
LVNV FUNDING LLC vs BRITTANY WISE | |||||||||
21CVF00067 | AUTUMN ESTES | 6/1/2021 | |||||||
MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT, INC. vs AUTUMN ESTES | |||||||||
20CVF01263 | DEBRA S. BOWES | 6/1/2021 | |||||||
CITIBANK, N.A. vs DEBRA S. BOWES | |||||||||
20CVF01105 | LILIAN ATREJENIO | 6/1/2021 | |||||||
LVNV FUNDING LLC vs LILIAN ATREJENIO | |||||||||
20CVF00959 | MARY MORAITES | 6/1/2021 | |||||||
CITIBANK N.A. vs MARY MORAITES | |||||||||
20CVF00567 | TIMOTHY CARTER | 6/1/2021 | |||||||
CBCS vs TIMOTHY CARTER | |||||||||
20CVF01330 | ERIN MELZONI | 5/26/2021 | |||||||
LVNV FUNDING LLC vs ERIN MELZONI | |||||||||
20CVF00867 | LINDA J. LAPORTE | 5/25/2021 | |||||||
PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOC. LLC vs LINDA J. LAPORTE | |||||||||
20CVF01282 | ROBERT L. HATFIELD | 5/25/2021 | |||||||
DISCOVER BANK C/O ZWICKER & ASSOCIATES, P.C. vs ROBERT L. HATFIELD | |||||||||
Previous 1, 2, 3 ... 205, 206, 207 ... 460, 461, 462 Next |