Daily Law Journal
2890 Cases | Miamisburg Municipal Judgements
Case Number Defendant Date
17CVF00272 MARYANN MESSER 9/22/2017
CREDIT CORP SOLUTIONS INC vs MARYANN MESSER
17CVF00929 REN J. BENNING 9/22/2017
DAY AIR CREDIT UNION, INC. vs REN J. BENNING
17CVF00875 ANDREW PARSONS AKA ANDREW J. PARSONS 9/22/2017
ONEMAIN FINANCIAL OF OHIO, INC., vs ANDREW PARSONS AKA ANDREW J. PARSONS
17CVF00611 REBECCA S. BERRY AKA REBECCA S. SEYMOUR 9/22/2017
CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA) N.A. C/O CHEEK LAW OFFICES, LLC vs REBECCA S. BERRY AKA REBEC...
17CVF01033 ERMA DONOVAN 9/22/2017
DISCOVER BANK C/O DISCOVER PRODUCTS, INC. vs ERMA DONOVAN
17CVF00923 CLARENCE R. MYERS 9/22/2017
DISCOVER BANK C/O DISCOVER PRODUCTS, INC. vs CLARENCE R. MYERS
17CVF00720 JIMMIE D. CLARK 9/22/2017
CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA) N.A. C/O CHEEK LAW OFFICES, LLC vs JIMMIE D. CLARK
17CVG01121 MELISSA GAY, ET AL. 9/22/2017
NAGRA PROPERTIES LLC vs MELISSA GAY, ET AL.
17CVF00465 TONDIA K. DOSSETT 9/22/2017
TD BANK USA, N.A. vs TONDIA K. DOSSETT
17CVF00939 DANIAL BELL 9/22/2017
MIDLAND FUNDING LLC DBI OHIO MIDLAND FUNDING DE LLC vs DANIAL BELL
17CVF00911 ROBERT CRIDER JR., AKA ROBERT W. CRIDER JR. 9/22/2017
ONEMAIN FINANCIAL OF OHIO, INC., vs ROBERT CRIDER JR., AKA ROBERT W. CRIDER JR.
17CVF00647 KELLY B. CLAWSON 9/22/2017
CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA) , NA vs KELLY B. CLAWSON
17CVG00044 KIMBERLY STRICKLIN, ET. AL 9/22/2017
CMC PROPERTIES vs KIMBERLY STRICKLIN, ET. AL
17CVG00105 ARTHUR MARTIN, JR. AKA ARTHUR MARTIN, ET. AL 9/20/2017
SUNDANCE PROPERTY MANAGEMENT DBA CARROLLTON POINTE APARTMENTS vs ARTHUR MARTIN, JR. ...
17CVF00665 TIMMIKA M. TORY 9/18/2017
PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC vs TIMMIKA M. TORY
06CVH01988 JAIME L ARGENBRIGHT 9/15/2017
NORTH STAR CAPITAL ACQU vs JAIME L ARGENBRIGHT
17CVG00514 JESSICA CAUPP, ET. AL 9/15/2017
JEFF FANNIN vs JESSICA CAUPP, ET. AL
17CVI00351 ROGER A. LEDBETTER, JR. 9/15/2017
ALMEDIA COURT, LLC vs ROGER A. LEDBETTER, JR.
17CVF00844 STEPHANIE L. EVERAGE 9/14/2017
CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA) , NA vs STEPHANIE L. EVERAGE

Previous  1, 2, 3, 4 ... 143, 144, 145  Next