9246 Cases | Miamisburg Municipal Judgements
Case Number | Defendant | Date | |||||||
CVF2100161 | AKERS, HENRY | 10/12/2021 | |||||||
LVNV FUNDING LLC vs AKERS, HENRY | |||||||||
CVF2100271 | AKA STEPHANIE K, STEPHANIE PAL | 10/12/2021 | |||||||
LVNV FUNDING LLC vs AKA STEPHANIE K, STEPHANIE PAL | |||||||||
CVF2100273 | DANE, JOHN | 10/12/2021 | |||||||
LVNV FUNDING LLC vs DANE, JOHN | |||||||||
CVF2100336 | MIDKIFF, TREVIIR | 10/12/2021 | |||||||
LVNV FUNDING LLC vs MIDKIFF, TREVIIR | |||||||||
CVF2100339 | DANE, JOHN | 10/12/2021 | |||||||
LVNV FUNDING LLC vs DANE, JOHN | |||||||||
CVF2100565 | BAILEY, COURTNEY | 10/12/2021 | |||||||
REVCO SOLUTIONS, INC. vs BAILEY, COURTNEY | |||||||||
CVG2101221 | TURNER, MATT | 10/12/2021 | |||||||
MORGAN PROPERTIES vs TURNER, MATT | |||||||||
CVG2101226 | LOVE, WILLIE | 10/12/2021 | |||||||
EDWARD ROSE ASSOC., LLC vs LOVE, WILLIE | |||||||||
CVG2101228 | AUFDERHEIDE, AUGUSTINE | 10/12/2021 | |||||||
AUSTIN PARK APARTMENTS II vs AUFDERHEIDE, AUGUSTINE | |||||||||
CVF2100081 | TUSSEY, JEREMY | 10/12/2021 | |||||||
LVNV FUNDING LLC vs TUSSEY, JEREMY | |||||||||
CVG2101229 | DAVISON, DEJHA | 10/11/2021 | |||||||
AUSTIN PARK APARTMENTS II, LLC vs DAVISON, DEJHA | |||||||||
CVF2000944 | GLANDER, KENNETH | 10/8/2021 | |||||||
Midland Funding vs GLANDER, KENNETH | |||||||||
CVF2100307 | LEWIS, CHARLES J. | 10/6/2021 | |||||||
BYRIDER FINANCE, LLC vs LEWIS, CHARLES J. | |||||||||
CVF2100278 | COLE, CHEYENNE MADISO | 10/5/2021 | |||||||
BYRIDER FINANCE, LLC vs COLE, CHEYENNE MADISO | |||||||||
CVF2100293 | HATFIELD, VIRGINIA I. | 10/5/2021 | |||||||
TD BANK USA, N.A., AS SUCCESSO vs HATFIELD, VIRGINIA I. | |||||||||
CVF2001008 | LAFAYETTE, KERRI | 10/4/2021 | |||||||
UNIFUND CCR PARTNERS, LLC vs LAFAYETTE, KERRI | |||||||||
CVF2001563 | TABITHA VENTURES, INC. | 10/4/2021 | |||||||
DAYTON SUPERIOR CORPORATION vs TABITHA VENTURES, INC. | |||||||||
CVF2001327 | LINDSEY, DUANE | 10/1/2021 | |||||||
FRIENDLY FINANCE CORP vs LINDSEY, DUANE | |||||||||
CVF2001474 | AKA JESSICA FAI, JESSICA JOHNS | 9/30/2021 | |||||||
LVNV FUNDING LLC vs AKA JESSICA FAI, JESSICA JOHNS | |||||||||
Previous 1, 2, 3 ... 191, 192, 193 ... 461, 462, 463 Next |