9246 Cases | Miamisburg Municipal Judgements
Case Number | Defendant | Date | |||||||
CVG2101286 | DAMERON, MICHAEL | 11/8/2021 | |||||||
ORCHARD GLEN PROPERTIES, LLC vs DAMERON, MICHAEL | |||||||||
CVG2101130 | COLE, ARRIEL | 11/8/2021 | |||||||
WALLICK PROPERTIES MIDWEST vs COLE, ARRIEL | |||||||||
CVF2100666 | ROSENCRANS, BRANDY | 11/5/2021 | |||||||
CROWN ASSET MANAGEMENT, LLC vs ROSENCRANS, BRANDY | |||||||||
CVF2100787 | THATCHER, SHERI L. | 11/5/2021 | |||||||
MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT, INC vs THATCHER, SHERI L. | |||||||||
CVG2101487 | TERBUSH, BRANDON | 11/5/2021 | |||||||
AUSTIN PARK APTS II LLC vs TERBUSH, BRANDON | |||||||||
CVF2100594 | PICCOLI, NICK | 11/4/2021 | |||||||
DISCOVER BANK vs PICCOLI, NICK | |||||||||
CVF2100252 | GUZMAN, JR., CARLOS R | 11/3/2021 | |||||||
WESTLAKE SERVICES, LLC vs GUZMAN, JR., CARLOS R | |||||||||
CVH2101422 | REESE, JESSICA | 11/3/2021 | |||||||
MONTGOMERY CO ANIMAL RESOURCE vs REESE, JESSICA | |||||||||
CVF2100164 | OLDFIELD, KAYLA | 11/2/2021 | |||||||
CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A. vs OLDFIELD, KAYLA | |||||||||
CVF2100399 | REESE, SHAREE L. | 11/2/2021 | |||||||
CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA) N.A. vs REESE, SHAREE L. | |||||||||
CVF2100232 | CHOUDHURY, NASEEM A. | 11/1/2021 | |||||||
CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA) N.A. vs CHOUDHURY, NASEEM A. | |||||||||
CVG2101337 | GUDGER, LATONIA | 11/1/2021 | |||||||
3D VENTURES, LLC vs GUDGER, LATONIA | |||||||||
CVG2101108 | CREECH, ET AL, JAMIE L | 11/1/2021 | |||||||
OAKLEY PROPERTY GROUP, LLC vs CREECH, ET AL, JAMIE L | |||||||||
CVF2100999 | GIGOUS, STEVEN B | 11/1/2021 | |||||||
CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA) N.A. vs GIGOUS, STEVEN B | |||||||||
CVF2100829 | RANSOM, BRADLY | 11/1/2021 | |||||||
LVNV FUNDING LLC vs RANSOM, BRADLY | |||||||||
CVF2100817 | AKA AUTUMN FLOY, AUTUMN B BARK | 11/1/2021 | |||||||
LVNV FUNDING LLC vs AKA AUTUMN FLOY, AUTUMN B BARK | |||||||||
CVF2100783 | MORTON, THOMAS W. | 11/1/2021 | |||||||
BANK OF AMERICA, N.A. vs MORTON, THOMAS W. | |||||||||
CVG2101412 | FARROW, DAQUAWNA | 10/29/2021 | |||||||
HLAIHEL MOHAMAD vs FARROW, DAQUAWNA | |||||||||
CVF2100122 | DIPIETRO, JOSEPH C. | 10/28/2021 | |||||||
MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT, INC vs DIPIETRO, JOSEPH C. | |||||||||
Previous 1, 2, 3 ... 187, 188, 189 ... 461, 462, 463 Next |