9164 Cases | Miamisburg Municipal Judgements
Case Number | Defendant | Date | |||||||
CVG2101059 | MAOSA, GRACEM. | 10/18/2021 | |||||||
FALER ACQUISITIONS, LTD vs MAOSA, GRACEM. | |||||||||
CVG2101288 | BROWN, AARON | 10/15/2021 | |||||||
WALLICK PROPERTIES MIDWEST vs BROWN, AARON | |||||||||
CVG2101292 | CRIDER, VALERIE | 10/15/2021 | |||||||
AHS, II, LLC DBA vs CRIDER, VALERIE | |||||||||
CVF2001269 | VIARS, PATRICIA L. | 10/15/2021 | |||||||
OX & ASSOC. CO LPA vs VIARS, PATRICIA L. | |||||||||
CVF2100855 | VAUGHN, RALPH A | 10/14/2021 | |||||||
MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT, INC vs VAUGHN, RALPH A | |||||||||
CVF2100421 | KUMAR INDURI, AJAY | 10/14/2021 | |||||||
AMERICAN EXPRESS NATIONAL BANK vs KUMAR INDURI, AJAY | |||||||||
CVF2100566 | BOGER, WILLIAM J. | 10/13/2021 | |||||||
REVCO SOLUTIONS, INC. vs BOGER, WILLIAM J. | |||||||||
CVI2100765 | HICKMAN AND SONS CONCRETE | 10/13/2021 | |||||||
DARRELL, DAVID vs HICKMAN AND SONS CONCRETE | |||||||||
CVF2100756 | JONES, TONI K. | 10/13/2021 | |||||||
REVCO SOLUTIONS, INC. vs JONES, TONI K. | |||||||||
CVF2100699 | FORD, JACQUELYNN | 10/13/2021 | |||||||
LVNV FUNDING LLC vs FORD, JACQUELYNN | |||||||||
CVF2100608 | CARDER, IAN | 10/13/2021 | |||||||
REVCO SOLUTIONS, INC. vs CARDER, IAN | |||||||||
CVF2100401 | GREEN, BANDON | 10/13/2021 | |||||||
LVNV FUNDING LLC vs GREEN, BANDON | |||||||||
CVF2100327 | BYRD, JEREMY | 10/13/2021 | |||||||
REVCO SOLUTIONS, INC. vs BYRD, JEREMY | |||||||||
CVF2100274 | RIEGER, JASON | 10/13/2021 | |||||||
LVNV FUNDING LLC vs RIEGER, JASON | |||||||||
CVF2100117 | AKA MELINDA SPR, MELINDA BLOUN | 10/13/2021 | |||||||
LVNV FUNDING LLC vs AKA MELINDA SPR, MELINDA BLOUN | |||||||||
CVF2001185 | PLAYER, BRANDON L. | 10/12/2021 | |||||||
WRIGHT-PATT CREDIT UNION vs PLAYER, BRANDON L. | |||||||||
CVF2001493 | AKA MICHELLE R, MICHELLE R. EC | 10/12/2021 | |||||||
FORD MOTOR CREDIT COMPANY vs AKA MICHELLE R, MICHELLE R. EC | |||||||||
CVF2100081 | TUSSEY, JEREMY | 10/12/2021 | |||||||
LVNV FUNDING LLC vs TUSSEY, JEREMY | |||||||||
CVF2100161 | AKERS, HENRY | 10/12/2021 | |||||||
LVNV FUNDING LLC vs AKERS, HENRY | |||||||||
Previous 1, 2, 3 ... 186, 187, 188 ... 457, 458, 459 Next |