Daily Law Journal
3723 Cases | Miamisburg Municipal Judgements
Case Number Defendant Date
13CVF00881 AMY LETTS 7/31/2013
CACH, LLC vs AMY LETTS
13CVF00808 PATRICIA SCHINDLER 7/31/2013
AUTOVEST, LLC C/O LEVY & ASSOC, LLC vs PATRICIA SCHINDLER
13CVI00971 LAWRENCE J WHITE ESQ 7/31/2013
BLAIR REPORTING SERVICES vs LAWRENCE J WHITE ESQ
13CVF00795 MICHELLE SCHECHTER 7/31/2013
MIDLAND FUNDING DE LLC vs MICHELLE SCHECHTER
13CVI00941 AIMEE BOWSER 7/30/2013
PHYLLIS FROUG vs AIMEE BOWSER
13CVF00478 TRACY T BAKER 7/26/2013
PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, L vs TRACY T BAKER
13CVI00563 AARON CHARLTON 7/26/2013
EDWARD L. BOCOCK vs AARON CHARLTON
13CVF00386 RACHELLE MCGUIRE 7/26/2013
PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOC., LLC vs RACHELLE MCGUIRE
13CVF00792 JACOB W. HARRIGAL 7/26/2013
MERCY DEFIANCE HOSPITAL vs JACOB W. HARRIGAL
13CVF00081 MARGARET GREGGORSON 7/26/2013
CAVALRY SPV I, LLC BUYER OF HSBC BANK NEVADA, N.A. vs MARGARET GREGGORSON
12CVG02187 SUSAN HAYES 7/25/2013
RANDY HARE vs SUSAN HAYES
13CVF00930 SHRINER BUILDING CO, LLC 7/23/2013
ROOFTEK ROOFING SUPPLIES vs SHRINER BUILDING CO, LLC
13CVF00809 TRIXIE A HAACKE 7/23/2013
CACH, LLC vs TRIXIE A HAACKE
12CVG02313 DAN TEATER, ET AL. 7/23/2013
NANCY WARRIX vs DAN TEATER, ET AL.
13CVF00342 DARLENE L DYER 7/18/2013
CAVALRY INVESTMENT LLC BUYER OF HSBC CARD SERVICES vs DARLENE L DYER
12CVE02073 MARCUS PERRY STOCKHOFF 7/17/2013
CINCINNATI INSURANCE CO. vs MARCUS PERRY STOCKHOFF
13CVF00410 ESRAA M ALMOSAWI 7/17/2013
ALLSTATE INSURANCE COMPANY vs ESRAA M ALMOSAWI
13CVF00845 ALAN T GREEN 7/16/2013
TD BANK USA NA AS SUCCESSOR TO TARGET NATL BANK vs ALAN T GREEN
13CVF00805 CONNIE S. FUCHS 7/16/2013
TD BANK USA NA vs CONNIE S. FUCHS

Previous  1, 2, 3 ... , 185, 186, 187  Next