9226 Cases | Miamisburg Municipal Judgements
Case Number | Defendant | Date | |||||||
CVG2101555 | THOMAS, TERRY | 12/2/2021 | |||||||
SL FLATS OWNER LLC AND HUDSON vs THOMAS, TERRY | |||||||||
CVG2101553 | KITCHEN, LAURYN | 12/2/2021 | |||||||
AUSTIN SPRINGS HOLDINGS, LLC vs KITCHEN, LAURYN | |||||||||
CVI2101135 | SELHORST, JENNIFER L. | 12/1/2021 | |||||||
SKIRA, MATTHEW T vs SELHORST, JENNIFER L. | |||||||||
CVG2101150 | LINDSEY, ANTHONY | 12/1/2021 | |||||||
FLETCHER, VICKI vs LINDSEY, ANTHONY | |||||||||
CVF2101209 | NICOLL, MORGAN K. | 12/1/2021 | |||||||
MOREHEAD STATE UNIVERSITY vs NICOLL, MORGAN K. | |||||||||
CVI2101405 | BOB'S DISCOUNT FURNITURE | 12/1/2021 | |||||||
THOMAS, KELLI vs BOB'S DISCOUNT FURNITURE | |||||||||
CVG2101607 | WEINLAND, DAVID | 12/1/2021 | |||||||
AHS II, LLC vs WEINLAND, DAVID | |||||||||
CVG2101534 | MARSHALL, DEBBIE | 11/30/2021 | |||||||
BLATZ, ANDREW vs MARSHALL, DEBBIE | |||||||||
CVG2101586 | DAY, WILLIAM JR | 11/30/2021 | |||||||
SUN SECURED FINANCING, LLC vs DAY, WILLIAM JR | |||||||||
CVG2101543 | WALKER, RYAN | 11/29/2021 | |||||||
MORGAN PROPERTIES MGMT CO, LLC vs WALKER, RYAN | |||||||||
CVG2101604 | LEUTPHOVA, ANOUSOME T | 11/29/2021 | |||||||
KETTERING ESTATES, LLC vs LEUTPHOVA, ANOUSOME T | |||||||||
CVG2101538 | PERRY, THERESA L. | 11/29/2021 | |||||||
REEDER, SUSAN P vs PERRY, THERESA L. | |||||||||
CVF2100071 | AKA ALONA A. CL, ALONA CLARK | 11/23/2021 | |||||||
VELOCITY INVESTMENTS LLC vs AKA ALONA A. CL, ALONA CLARK | |||||||||
CVF2100247 | PATTON, NADA N. | 11/23/2021 | |||||||
CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA) N.A. vs PATTON, NADA N. | |||||||||
CVI2101056 | CASHLAND FINANCIAL SERVICES | 11/23/2021 | |||||||
GREEN, SHCONYA vs CASHLAND FINANCIAL SERVICES | |||||||||
CVI2101081 | HADDIX, OWEN | 11/23/2021 | |||||||
WALKER AUTO GROUP, INC. vs HADDIX, OWEN | |||||||||
CVG2101387 | JENKINS, JASHARA | 11/23/2021 | |||||||
MORGAN PROP. MGMT COMPANY LLC vs JENKINS, JASHARA | |||||||||
CVG2101389 | MILLER, MICHAEL | 11/23/2021 | |||||||
MORGAN PROP MGMT COOMPANY LLC vs MILLER, MICHAEL | |||||||||
CVG2101390 | MORTLEY, MARVA | 11/23/2021 | |||||||
MORGAN PROP MGMT COMPANY LLC vs MORTLEY, MARVA | |||||||||
Previous 1, 2, 3 ... 184, 185, 186 ... 460, 461, 462 Next |