Daily Law Journal
3676 Cases | Miamisburg Municipal Judgements
Case Number Defendant Date
13CVF00792 JACOB W. HARRIGAL 7/26/2013
MERCY DEFIANCE HOSPITAL vs JACOB W. HARRIGAL
13CVF00478 TRACY T BAKER 7/26/2013
PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, L vs TRACY T BAKER
13CVI00563 AARON CHARLTON 7/26/2013
EDWARD L. BOCOCK vs AARON CHARLTON
12CVG02187 SUSAN HAYES 7/25/2013
RANDY HARE vs SUSAN HAYES
13CVF00809 TRIXIE A HAACKE 7/23/2013
CACH, LLC vs TRIXIE A HAACKE
12CVG02313 DAN TEATER, ET AL. 7/23/2013
NANCY WARRIX vs DAN TEATER, ET AL.
13CVF00930 SHRINER BUILDING CO, LLC 7/23/2013
ROOFTEK ROOFING SUPPLIES vs SHRINER BUILDING CO, LLC
13CVF00342 DARLENE L DYER 7/18/2013
CAVALRY INVESTMENT LLC BUYER OF HSBC CARD SERVICES vs DARLENE L DYER
13CVF00410 ESRAA M ALMOSAWI 7/17/2013
ALLSTATE INSURANCE COMPANY vs ESRAA M ALMOSAWI
12CVE02073 MARCUS PERRY STOCKHOFF 7/17/2013
CINCINNATI INSURANCE CO. vs MARCUS PERRY STOCKHOFF
13CVF00845 ALAN T GREEN 7/16/2013
TD BANK USA NA AS SUCCESSOR TO TARGET NATL BANK vs ALAN T GREEN
13CVF00805 CONNIE S. FUCHS 7/16/2013
TD BANK USA NA vs CONNIE S. FUCHS
13CVG00850 AARON COLLINS 7/11/2013
BETTY ECKHART vs AARON COLLINS
13CVF00182 TERRI R. MARCH 7/11/2013
CREDIT ACCEPTANCE CORP vs TERRI R. MARCH
12CVG02381 TRACY KING, ET AL 7/11/2013
ORPHEUS L. GARRISON vs TRACY KING, ET AL
13CVF00475 GUEYE M. BESSE 7/11/2013
FIA CARD SERVICES, NA vs GUEYE M. BESSE
13CVF00641 CAROLYN TANNER 7/9/2013
MIDLAND FUNDING LLC DBA MIDLAND FUNDING DE LLC vs CAROLYN TANNER
13CVF00544 IMAN A TINAWI 7/9/2013
CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA N.A. C/O CHEEK LAW OFFICES LLC vs IMAN A TINAWI
13CVI00594 SHELLY JOHNSON 7/9/2013
JEREMY M TRAPP vs SHELLY JOHNSON

Previous  1, 2, 3 ... 182, 183, 184