9246 Cases | Miamisburg Municipal Judgements
Case Number | Defendant | Date | |||||||
CVG2200098 | HALL, ATSEDE | 2/8/2022 | |||||||
EDWARD ROSE ASSOC. LLC vs HALL, ATSEDE | |||||||||
CVF2001264 | ATKINSON, TYLER S. | 2/7/2022 | |||||||
DEPARTMENT STORES NATIONAL BAN vs ATKINSON, TYLER S. | |||||||||
CVG2200045 | SHELL, CHAD T | 2/7/2022 | |||||||
MAD RIVER APTS II, LLC vs SHELL, CHAD T | |||||||||
CVG2200128 | DAVISON, DEJHA | 2/7/2022 | |||||||
AUSTIN PARK APTS. II LLC vs DAVISON, DEJHA | |||||||||
CVF2100549 | JAMES, DONALD | 2/4/2022 | |||||||
CACH, LLC. vs JAMES, DONALD | |||||||||
CVF2101120 | CAMPBELL, JOHN W | 2/4/2022 | |||||||
CAPITALONE BANK, N.A. vs CAMPBELL, JOHN W | |||||||||
CVF2101723 | SCARBERRY, SYDNEY | 2/4/2022 | |||||||
CAPITALONE BANK USA NA vs SCARBERRY, SYDNEY | |||||||||
CVF2101333 | MURRAY, MARK A JR | 2/2/2022 | |||||||
JPMORGAN CHASE BANK N.A. vs MURRAY, MARK A JR | |||||||||
CVH0802707 | MERGLER, JONATHAN | 2/2/2022 | |||||||
PALISADES COLLECTION, LLC vs MERGLER, JONATHAN | |||||||||
CVF2101709 | ERBAUGH, DEAN | 2/2/2022 | |||||||
DNF ASSOC. LLC vs ERBAUGH, DEAN | |||||||||
CVF2101577 | NEGRON-TORRES, GERMAN ANTONIO | 2/2/2022 | |||||||
HS FINANCIAL GROUP, LLC vs NEGRON-TORRES, GERMAN ANTONIO | |||||||||
CVF2101335 | MURRAY, MARK A JR | 2/2/2022 | |||||||
JPMORGAN CHASE BANK, N.A. vs MURRAY, MARK A JR | |||||||||
CVF2101299 | SHELLEY, CHRISTOPHER C | 2/2/2022 | |||||||
JPMORGAN CHASEB ANK N.A. vs SHELLEY, CHRISTOPHER C | |||||||||
CVF2100047 | HATFIELD, ROBERT L. | 2/2/2022 | |||||||
CAPITALONE BANK (USA), N.A. vs HATFIELD, ROBERT L. | |||||||||
CVF2001133 | WHITE, VICTORIA | 2/2/2022 | |||||||
ONEMAIN FINANCIAL GROUP, LLC vs WHITE, VICTORIA | |||||||||
CVF2001567 | HATFIELD, VIRGINIA I. | 2/1/2022 | |||||||
CITIBANK, N.A. vs HATFIELD, VIRGINIA I. | |||||||||
CVF2100136 | WELLS, BRITNEY A. | 2/1/2022 | |||||||
BANK OF AMERICA, N.A. vs WELLS, BRITNEY A. | |||||||||
CVF2100426 | STANCH, SARA | 2/1/2022 | |||||||
VELOCITY INVESTMENTS LLC vs STANCH, SARA | |||||||||
CVF2100454 | YARCHUK, ALEC C. | 2/1/2022 | |||||||
TDBANK USA, N.A. vs YARCHUK, ALEC C. | |||||||||
Previous 1, 2, 3 ... 182, 183, 184 ... 461, 462, 463 Next |