Daily Law Journal
3676 Cases | Miamisburg Municipal Judgements
Case Number Defendant Date
13CVF01060 SHAUNA S. KREITZERMAYVILLE 8/28/2013
CBCS vs SHAUNA S. KREITZERMAYVILLE
05CVH00324 KENNETH LEWIS SR 8/28/2013
AUTOVEST LLC ASGN OF 5/3 vs KENNETH LEWIS SR
13CVF00150 LINDA ELLIS 8/27/2013
SUNDANCE PROPERTY MANAGEMENT vs LINDA ELLIS
13CVF00856 ADAM I. KERR 8/27/2013
BARCLAYS BANK DELAWARE vs ADAM I. KERR
13CVF00706 DAVID S. FINSTER 8/27/2013
STERLING JEWELERS INC. DBA OSTERMAN JEWELERS vs DAVID S. FINSTER
12CVF02319 DIANA PAVY 8/27/2013
CHARLES HOLLOWAY vs DIANA PAVY
13CVF00810 BIANCA NEAL 8/27/2013
CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA) , NA vs BIANCA NEAL
13CVF00701 CHARLES R BECKELHEIMER 8/27/2013
CREDIT ACCEPTANC CORP. vs CHARLES R BECKELHEIMER
12CVH01362 RONALD DICK DBA RESCUE ROOFING SATELLITE 8/27/2013
DAN PATTON vs RONALD DICK DBA RESCUE ROOFING SATELLITE
13CVF00756 JEFFREY W CONKLE 8/27/2013
CAVALRY SPV I, LLC vs JEFFREY W CONKLE
13CVG00335 JANELLE CLARK, ET AL. 8/21/2013
ORPHEUS L GARRISON vs JANELLE CLARK, ET AL.
13CVG00334 RAY BALLINGER 8/21/2013
ORPHEUS L. GARRISON vs RAY BALLINGER
13CVG01209 CINDY PITTMAN, ET AL. 8/20/2013
SHIRLEY KINCAID vs CINDY PITTMAN, ET AL.
12CVF02371 MARY THOMAS 8/20/2013
A1 TRUE PERFECTION LLC vs MARY THOMAS
13CVF00884 YVONNE DELGADO 8/19/2013
LVNV FUNDING LLC C/O LEVY & ASSOCIATES, LLC vs YVONNE DELGADO
13CVF00637 DON CHIVERS, ET AL 8/19/2013
EAGLE LOAN COMPANY OF OHIO, INC vs DON CHIVERS, ET AL
13CVF00849 JEWEL I. HASKINS 8/14/2013
UNIFUND CCR, LLC vs JEWEL I. HASKINS
13CVG01071 CHRIS NYJAK 8/12/2013
ROBERT DENNIS vs CHRIS NYJAK
13CVF00700 LEEANN KELLY 8/8/2013
MIDLAND FUNDING LLC DBA IN OHIO MIDLAND FUNDING DE vs LEEANN KELLY

Previous  1, 2, 3 ... 181, 182, 183, 184  Next