9226 Cases | Miamisburg Municipal Judgements
Case Number | Defendant | Date | |||||||
CVF2101616 | DAVIS, JENNIFER L | 2/22/2022 | |||||||
MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT INC vs DAVIS, JENNIFER L | |||||||||
CVG2101680 | METCALF, JOHNNY | 2/22/2022 | |||||||
MIMG CLXXI vs METCALF, JOHNNY | |||||||||
CVG2200086 | MINK, JEREMY | 2/22/2022 | |||||||
ELON PROP. MGMT. vs MINK, JEREMY | |||||||||
CVG2200201 | OSBORNE, MAZZIE | 2/22/2022 | |||||||
SUN SECURED FINANCING LLC vs OSBORNE, MAZZIE | |||||||||
CVF2101547 | SEYFER, WENDY | 2/22/2022 | |||||||
PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES vs SEYFER, WENDY | |||||||||
CVF2101303 | CARMONA, KENNETH | 2/18/2022 | |||||||
LVNV FUNDING LLC vs CARMONA, KENNETH | |||||||||
CVG2200124 | BENOIT, ASHLIE | 2/17/2022 | |||||||
SUNDANCE PROP. MGMT. LLC vs BENOIT, ASHLIE | |||||||||
CVF2101459 | HARVEY, REGINALD | 2/16/2022 | |||||||
CAPITAL ONE BANK USA NA vs HARVEY, REGINALD | |||||||||
CVI2101403 | `FETCH PUPPIES | 2/16/2022 | |||||||
WILLIAMSON, TAVIA vs `FETCH PUPPIES | |||||||||
CVF2100423 | REIGER, JASON | 2/15/2022 | |||||||
LVNV FUNDING LLC vs REIGER, JASON | |||||||||
CVF2100403 | HATFIELD, ROBERT | 2/15/2022 | |||||||
WILMINGTON SAVINGS FUND SOCIET vs HATFIELD, ROBERT | |||||||||
CVF2100389 | RAMSEY, CHARLES W. | 2/15/2022 | |||||||
CHRISTIAN FAMILY CREDIT UNION, vs RAMSEY, CHARLES W. | |||||||||
CVF2100382 | BROWN, ANTWAUN | 2/15/2022 | |||||||
CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA) N.A. vs BROWN, ANTWAUN | |||||||||
CVF2100341 | EDGINGTON, JUSTIN | 2/15/2022 | |||||||
LVNV FUNDING LLC vs EDGINGTON, JUSTIN | |||||||||
CVF2100244 | HARVEY, REGINALD | 2/15/2022 | |||||||
CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA) N.A. vs HARVEY, REGINALD | |||||||||
CVF2100102 | FOLKERTH, RACHEL | 2/15/2022 | |||||||
JEFFERSONCAPITAL SYSTEMS, LLC vs FOLKERTH, RACHEL | |||||||||
CVF2100057 | REINHART, CAROLINE L. | 2/15/2022 | |||||||
SECOND ROUND SUB, LLC. vs REINHART, CAROLINE L. | |||||||||
CVF2100043 | NAWA, ROBERT | 2/15/2022 | |||||||
JEFFERSONCAPITAL SYSSTEMS, LL vs NAWA, ROBERT | |||||||||
CVF2001459 | BELL, LAURA | 2/15/2022 | |||||||
CROWN ASSET MANAGEMENT, LLC vs BELL, LAURA | |||||||||
Previous 1, 2, 3 ... 171, 172, 173 ... 460, 461, 462 Next |