9246 Cases | Miamisburg Municipal Judgements
Case Number | Defendant | Date | |||||||
CVG2200021 | PHILPOT, DAVE | 3/1/2022 | |||||||
HALL, CELIA V vs PHILPOT, DAVE | |||||||||
CVG2200133 | THOMPSON, ANGELO | 3/1/2022 | |||||||
LORRIC REALTY LLC vs THOMPSON, ANGELO | |||||||||
CVG2200167 | BANKS, LOGAN | 3/1/2022 | |||||||
ONE 4 YOU INVESTMENTS LLC vs BANKS, LOGAN | |||||||||
CVG2200177 | HARRIS, SHAUN | 3/1/2022 | |||||||
AUSTIN SPRINGS HOLDINGS, LLC vs HARRIS, SHAUN | |||||||||
CVG2200182 | ANGLIN, SHANE | 3/1/2022 | |||||||
AUSTIN SPRINGS HOLDINGS, LLC vs ANGLIN, SHANE | |||||||||
CVG2200186 | GANTZ, ANDREW | 3/1/2022 | |||||||
AUSTIN SPRINGS HOLDINGS, LLC vs GANTZ, ANDREW | |||||||||
CVG2200187 | LYKINS, JENNIFER | 3/1/2022 | |||||||
ALI PROPERTIES, LLC vs LYKINS, JENNIFER | |||||||||
CVF2101715 | GIBSON, MICHAEL | 3/1/2022 | |||||||
REVCO SOLUTIONS, INC vs GIBSON, MICHAEL | |||||||||
CVF2101780 | BROOKS, KAITLYN | 2/28/2022 | |||||||
PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, vs BROOKS, KAITLYN | |||||||||
CVG2200200 | LANKFORD, LARA | 2/28/2022 | |||||||
SUN SECURED FINANCING LLC vs LANKFORD, LARA | |||||||||
CVF2001539 | AKA OSCAR J. JO, OSCAR YORK | 2/28/2022 | |||||||
LVNV FUNDING LLC FORMER vs AKA OSCAR J. JO, OSCAR YORK | |||||||||
CVF2001417 | HANES, REBECCA L. | 2/28/2022 | |||||||
UNIVERSAL 1 CREDIT UNION vs HANES, REBECCA L. | |||||||||
CVF2200057 | BAYYOUD, IMAD | 2/25/2022 | |||||||
CROWN ASSET MANAGEMENT, LLC vs BAYYOUD, IMAD | |||||||||
CVG2200131 | MARTIN, CRESTA | 2/25/2022 | |||||||
GILBERT, LINDA L vs MARTIN, CRESTA | |||||||||
CVF2000564 | CEBALLOS, EPIFANIO | 2/24/2022 | |||||||
MIDLAND FUNDING LLC vs CEBALLOS, EPIFANIO | |||||||||
CVF2100184 | STEELE, LACEY | 2/24/2022 | |||||||
JHPDE FINANCE I, LLC vs STEELE, LACEY | |||||||||
CVF2101293 | MAY, BOBBIE S | 2/24/2022 | |||||||
DISCOVER BANK C/O DISCOVER vs MAY, BOBBIE S | |||||||||
CVF2200153 | CELEBUCKI, JAMES H | 2/24/2022 | |||||||
REVCO SOLUTIONS INC vs CELEBUCKI, JAMES H | |||||||||
CVF2101245 | GRIFFITH, CONNIE | 2/23/2022 | |||||||
DISCOVER BANK vs GRIFFITH, CONNIE | |||||||||
Previous 1, 2, 3 ... 170, 171, 172 ... 461, 462, 463 Next |