9246 Cases | Miamisburg Municipal Judgements
Case Number | Defendant | Date | |||||||
CVF2101794 | JONES, DORIAN | 4/26/2022 | |||||||
MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT, INC vs JONES, DORIAN | |||||||||
CVF2200054 | MADSEN, QUINTINNE | 4/26/2022 | |||||||
UHG I, LLC vs MADSEN, QUINTINNE | |||||||||
CVF2200079 | WILLIS, ASHLEY | 4/26/2022 | |||||||
SIMMS MGMT CORPORATION vs WILLIS, ASHLEY | |||||||||
CVG2200405 | PITTS, CIERA | 4/26/2022 | |||||||
PREMIERWEST CARROLLTONOH LLC vs PITTS, CIERA | |||||||||
CVG2200468 | RAMSEY, CHARLES | 4/26/2022 | |||||||
AUSTIN SPRINGS HOLDINGS LLC vs RAMSEY, CHARLES | |||||||||
CVF2101625 | JEFFREYS, TORIAN D | 4/26/2022 | |||||||
CAPITAL ONE BANK US NA vs JEFFREYS, TORIAN D | |||||||||
CVF2100104 | BECKNER, ALLISON KATHERI | 4/25/2022 | |||||||
BANK OF AMERICA N.A. vs BECKNER, ALLISON KATHERI | |||||||||
CVF2100181 | REFFITT, SHELBI | 4/25/2022 | |||||||
JEFFERSON CAPITAL SYSTEMS LLC vs REFFITT, SHELBI | |||||||||
CVF2200014 | SCHOENBERGER, STEVEN | 4/25/2022 | |||||||
LVNV FUNDING, LLC vs SCHOENBERGER, STEVEN | |||||||||
CVF2200310 | PATTON, KATHY | 4/25/2022 | |||||||
THE HUNTINGTON NATIONAL BANK vs PATTON, KATHY | |||||||||
CVF2100857 | SAMS, CAROLYN A | 4/8/2022 | |||||||
MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT, INC vs SAMS, CAROLYN A | |||||||||
CVF2200042 | BARON, ELLEN L | 4/7/2022 | |||||||
CAPITAL ONE BANK USA NA vs BARON, ELLEN L | |||||||||
CVI2200421 | MELANATED VISIONARIES, LLC | 4/7/2022 | |||||||
NEWMAN, TONI L vs MELANATED VISIONARIES, LLC | |||||||||
CVG2200363 | HUGHES, JUDIE | 4/6/2022 | |||||||
RTB MAPLE RUN LLC vs HUGHES, JUDIE | |||||||||
CVF2100734 | JUSTICE, TIMOTHY R | 4/5/2022 | |||||||
CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA) N.A. vs JUSTICE, TIMOTHY R | |||||||||
CVF2101180 | BLEVINS, GREGORY | 4/5/2022 | |||||||
UHG I LLC vs BLEVINS, GREGORY | |||||||||
CVF2101371 | CRUM, TRAVIS D | 4/5/2022 | |||||||
JP MORGAN CHASE BANK NA vs CRUM, TRAVIS D | |||||||||
CVF2101424 | BYRD, GERALYNN M | 4/5/2022 | |||||||
DISCOVER BANK vs BYRD, GERALYNN M | |||||||||
CVF2101654 | POWELL, KIMBERLY M | 4/5/2022 | |||||||
CALVARY SPV I, LLC vs POWELL, KIMBERLY M | |||||||||
Previous 1, 2, 3 ... 162, 163, 164 ... 461, 462, 463 Next |